Senate | 05/09/2025 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 30). | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Set for hearing April 30. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Set for hearing April 21. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Referred to Coms. on B. P. & E.D. and ED. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2025 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |