All Bills - Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR27
Introduced
3/29/23
Introduced
3/29/23
Engrossed
3/29/23
This Concurrent Resolution designates the week of February 27-March 3, 2023 PUBLIC SCHOOLS WEEK and commends the hard work of educators and staff. It also calls upon Delawareans to support public schools.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR28
Introduced
3/30/23
Engrossed
4/5/23
Introduced
3/30/23
Engrossed
4/5/23
This Concurrent Resolution designates March 30, 2023, as Atheist Awareness Day in Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR29
Introduced
3/29/23
Introduced
3/29/23
Engrossed
3/29/23
This Concurrent Resolution recognizes March 8, 2023, as "National Women-Owned Small Business Day" in Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR3
Introduced
1/18/23
Introduced
1/18/23
Engrossed
1/18/23
This House Concurrent Resolution designates January 23, 2023, as "Maternal Health Awareness Day" in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR30
Introduced
4/4/23
Introduced
4/4/23
Engrossed
4/4/23
This Concurrent Resolution recognizes Ramadan and Muslim residents of this State as they observe Ramadan.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR31
Introduced
3/30/23
Engrossed
4/4/23
Introduced
3/30/23
Engrossed
4/4/23
This concurrent resolution commemorates March 31st as International Transgender Day of Visibility.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR32
Introduced
4/4/23
Introduced
4/4/23
Engrossed
4/4/23
This Concurrent Resolution recognizes the contributions of the Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc. chapters in the State of Delaware and declares April 4, 2023, to be Delta Day at the Delaware Capital.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR33
Introduced
4/4/23
Introduced
4/4/23
Engrossed
4/4/23
This House Concurrent Resolution recognizes the month of April 2023 as National Fair Housing Month in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR34
Introduced
4/4/23
Introduced
4/4/23
Engrossed
4/4/23
This House Concurrent Resolution recognizes April 2023 as Autism Acceptance and Inclusion Month and Autism Delaware's 25 years of service to the people of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR35
Introduced
4/5/23
Introduced
4/5/23
Engrossed
4/5/23
This Concurrent Resolution recognizes the Delaware Municipal Electric Corporation and community-owned, not-for-profit electric utilities throughout Delaware for their dedication to serving their communities with energy saving programs and carbon reduction projects. This Resolution also celebrates DEMECs upcoming 44th anniversary and over 100 years of reliable and safe electric service from Delawares local public power utilities by proclaiming April 5, 2023, as DEMEC Day.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR36
Introduced
4/6/23
Introduced
4/6/23
Engrossed
4/6/23
This Concurrent Resolution recognizes April 6, 2023, as Alpha Kappa Alpha Sorority, Incorporated or AKA Day at the Capital in Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR37
Introduced
4/27/23
Introduced
4/27/23
Engrossed
4/27/23
This Resolution recognizes the month of April 2023 as "National Donate Life Month" in Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR38
Introduced
4/26/23
Introduced
4/26/23
Engrossed
4/26/23
This Concurrent Resolution designates April 26, 2023, as "4-H Day" in the State of Delaware and calls upon Delaware's citizens to recognize the many contributions of the State's 4-H programs
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR39
Introduced
5/2/23
Introduced
5/2/23
Engrossed
5/2/23
This Resolution honors the contributions of the 6888th Central Postal Directory Battalion of the Women's Army Corps.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR4
Introduced
1/25/23
Introduced
1/25/23
Engrossed
1/25/23
Cholangiocarcinoma, also known as bile duct cancer, is a cancer that occurs in the bile ducts in or outside the liver. This Resolution recognizes February 12, 2023 as "World Cholangiocarcinoma Day" in Delaware.