All Bills - Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR95
Introduced
3/20/24
Introduced
3/20/24
Engrossed
3/20/24
This House Concurrent Resolution recognizes the month of March 2024 as Multiple Sclerosis Month in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR96
Introduced
3/21/24
Introduced
3/21/24
Engrossed
3/21/24
This House Concurrent Resolution designates the 21st day of the Month of March 2024 as Rock Your Socks for World Down Syndrome Day and celebrates the beauty and contributions that people with Down syndrome make in Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR97
Introduced
3/21/24
Introduced
3/21/24
Engrossed
3/21/24
This House Concurrent Resolution proclaims the month of April 2024 as Sikh Awareness and Appreciation Month in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR98
Introduced
3/26/24
Introduced
3/26/24
Refer
3/26/24
This resolution requests the Governor of Delaware provide recommendations for the future of education by addressing funding, improving academic performance, standardized testing, and school safety and climate to the 153rd Delaware General Assembly by June 30, 2025.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR99
Introduced
3/21/24
Introduced
3/21/24
Engrossed
3/21/24
This House Concurrent Resolution recognizes March 21st, 2024, as "Rosie the Riveter Day" in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HJR1
Introduced
1/25/23
Introduced
1/25/23
Engrossed
3/9/23
Refer
1/25/23
Engrossed
3/9/23
Enrolled
3/16/23
Refer
3/9/23
Passed
3/29/23
Enrolled
3/16/23
Passed
3/29/23
This Joint Resolution creates a bi-partisan School Mentoring and Literacy Task Force, designed to expand volunteer mentoring and literacy education in Delaware schools ,with a report due on June 1, 2023.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HJR2
Introduced
6/21/23
Introduced
6/21/23
Engrossed
6/22/23
Refer
6/21/23
Enrolled
6/27/23
Engrossed
6/22/23
Passed
6/30/23
Enrolled
6/27/23
Passed
6/30/23
This Resolution provides the official revenue, refund, and unencumbered funds estimates for Fiscal Year 2023.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HJR3
Introduced
6/21/23
Introduced
6/21/23
Engrossed
6/22/23
Refer
6/21/23
Enrolled
6/27/23
Engrossed
6/22/23
Passed
6/30/23
Enrolled
6/27/23
Passed
6/30/23
This Resolution provides the official revenue, refund, and unencumbered funds estimates for Fiscal Year 2024.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HR1
Introduced
1/10/23
Introduced
1/10/23
This resolution resolves that Peter C. Schwartzkopf be elected as Speaker of the House of Representatives.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HR10
Introduced
3/30/23
Introduced
3/30/23
Refer
3/30/23
This resolution creates the Permanent Rules of the House of Representatives. It is different from the Temporary Rules (House Resolution No. 3) in that it adds Rule 49 governing remote participation, restores Rule 12(b) with modification, and removes rules relating to emergency operations.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HR11
Introduced
5/9/23
Introduced
5/9/23
This House Resolution recognizes May 10, 2023 as Major George S. Welch Day in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HR12
Introduced
5/11/23
Introduced
5/11/23
This Resolution recognizes May 7-13, 2023 as Delaware Correctional Officers and Employees Week in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HR13
Introduced
5/18/23
Introduced
5/18/23
This House Resolution recognizes and commends speech-language pathologists and audiologists throughout this State for their work with citizens of this State to lead independent, productive, and fulfilling lives.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HR14
Introduced
6/8/23
Introduced
6/8/23
This Resolution honors the Delaware Department of Transportation for winning first place and fourth place in the ten-wheel truck competition and second and eleventh place in the six-wheel truck competition at the 2022 APWA National Snow Roadeo, which was held from September 28 to September 30, 2022 in Loveland, Colorado.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HR15
Introduced
5/11/23
Introduced
5/11/23
This House Resolution recognizes Sunday, May 14, 2023, as a very special day for all mothers in the State of Delaware and calls on all Delawareans to reflect on the many selfless acts of their own mothers.