All Bills - Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HR16
Introduced
6/15/23
Introduced
6/15/23
This resolution recognizes June 18, 2023 as Fathers Day in Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HR17
Introduced
6/22/23
Introduced
6/22/23
Failed
6/22/23
This resolution requests that the Department of Natural Resources pause its ongoing process of promulgating California ACCII regulations. The Department is requested to determine the fiscal impacts of imposing the ACCII regulations on Delawareans. A further request is made that the Department evaluate the approach taken by Pennsylvania and Colorado, two states that, like Delaware, have chosen to follow California vehicle emissions regulations under Section 177 of the U.S. Clean Air Act. The Department is also requested to evaluate the protocol observed by 33 other states in following the EPA vehicle emission regulations.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HR18
Introduced
6/27/23
Introduced
6/27/23
This Resolution recognizes the importance of swimming safety and encourages Delaware residents to take swimming lessons, learn about swimming risks, and ensure their safety when participating in water activities. It also acknowledges the benefits of swimming and other water activities, including fostering of community and the building of lifelong friendships.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HR19
Introduced
6/29/23
Introduced
6/29/23
This resolution recognizes the month of October 2023 as Breast Cancer Awareness Month.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HR2
Introduced
1/10/23
Introduced
1/10/23
This Resolution designates Richard L. Puffer as Chief Clerk of the House of Representatives and Dolores Michels as Assistant Chief Clerk of the House of Representative to serve at the pleasure of the House of Representatives.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HR20
Introduced
6/29/23
Introduced
6/29/23
This Resolution recognizes Thursday, June 29, 2023, as Staff Appreciation Day in the House of Representatives.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HR21
Introduced
6/29/23
Introduced
6/29/23
This resolution recognizes the month of September 2023 as Alopecia Awareness Month.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HR22
Introduced
6/30/23
Introduced
6/30/23
This House Resolution extends the deadline for the Internet Sports Lottery Legislative Working Group to provide its recommendations to the House of Representatives from June 30, 2023 to December 1, 2023.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HR23
Introduced
4/17/24
Introduced
4/17/24
This House Resolution recognizes April 17, 2024, as Delaware Teach Children to Save Day.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HR24
Introduced
4/25/24
Introduced
4/25/24
This resolution recognizes April 27th as World Trade Center® Delaware Day.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HR25
Introduced
6/30/23
Introduced
6/30/23
Relating To The Election Of The Speaker Of The House Of Representatives.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HR26
Introduced
1/9/24
Introduced
1/9/24
This House Resolution calls upon Delawares federal delegation, President Biden, and the Presidents administration to work towards a permanent ceasefire between Israel and Hamas, including the release of all hostages and prisoners of war by both sides, delivery of immediate and sustained humanitarian aid to Gaza, and diplomatic action to facilitate long-term peace in the region.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HR27
Introduced
5/9/24
Introduced
5/9/24
This House Resolution recognizes Sunday, May 12, 2024, as a very special day for all mothers in the State of Delaware and calls on all Delawareans to reflect on the many selfless acts of their own mothers.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HR28
Introduced
5/23/24
Introduced
5/23/24
This resolution recognizes the last Monday of May as Memorial Day.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HR29
Introduced
6/26/24
Introduced
6/26/24
This Resolution recognizes Wednesday, June 26, 2024, as Staff Appreciation Day in the House of Representatives.