All Bills - Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR100
Introduced
6/29/23
Failed
6/13/24
Introduced
6/29/23
Failed
6/13/24
This resolution is an application for a Convention of the States under Article V of the Constitution of the United States.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR101
Introduced
6/29/23
Introduced
6/29/23
Engrossed
6/29/23
This resolution recognizes October 1, 2023, as "FAFSA Day" in Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR102
Introduced
6/30/23
Introduced
6/30/23
Engrossed
6/30/23
This Resolution establishes the Firearm Definition Task Force (Task Force) to do all of the following:
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR103
Introduced
11/16/23
Engrossed
1/9/24
Introduced
11/16/23
Engrossed
1/9/24
This Resolution establishes the Delaware Aquaculture Task Force.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR104
Introduced
1/9/24
Introduced
1/9/24
Engrossed
1/9/24
This Concurrent Resolution recognizes January 9, 2024, as "Law Enforcement Appreciation Day" in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR105
Introduced
1/9/24
Introduced
1/9/24
Engrossed
1/9/24
This Concurrent Resolution extends the reporting date of the Victims Bill of Rights Committee from January 15, 2024 to March 1, 2024.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR106
Introduced
3/5/24
Introduced
3/5/24
Engrossed
3/5/24
This Concurrent Resolution recognizes March 5, 2024, as Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Incorporated or Alpha Phi Alpha Day at the Capitol in Delaware. It honors Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Incorporated as an organization that has provided a voice and a strong vision to the struggle of African Americans and people of color in the State of Delaware and around the world.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR107
Introduced
1/11/24
Introduced
1/11/24
Engrossed
1/11/24
This Senate Concurrent Resolution honors and recognizes the leadership, achievements, and sacrifices of Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. and urges all citizens of the First State to participate fittingly in the observance of Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. Day on January 15, 2024.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR108
Introduced
1/11/24
Introduced
1/11/24
Engrossed
1/11/24
This Concurrent Resolution welcomes Minister Jack Chambers upon his visit to the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR109
Introduced
1/25/24
Introduced
1/25/24
Engrossed
1/25/24
This concurrent resolution designates February 2024 as Turner Syndrome Awareness Month in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR11
Introduced
3/14/23
Introduced
3/14/23
Engrossed
3/14/23
This Resolution recognizes March 18, 2023, as National Public Defense Day.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR110
Introduced
1/23/24
Introduced
1/23/24
Engrossed
1/23/24
This concurrent resolution designates February 2024 as Career and Technical Education Month in the State of Delaware to urge all citizens to become familiar with the services and benefits offered by the career and technical education programs in their communities, and to support and participate in these programs to enhance their individual skills and productivity.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR111
Introduced
1/25/24
Introduced
1/25/24
Engrossed
1/25/24
This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes February 4, 2024, as "USO Day" in the State of Delaware and honors USO Delaware for its important and inspiring work supporting military members and their families.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR112
Introduced
1/24/24
Introduced
1/24/24
Engrossed
1/24/24
This resolution recognizes and celebrates the Chinese New Year 2024.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR113
Introduced
1/25/24
Introduced
1/25/24
Engrossed
1/25/24
This Concurrent Resolution honors and recognizes the leadership and achievements of African Americans and urges the celebration of Black History Month.