All Bills - Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR114

Introduced
1/25/24  
Introduced
1/25/24  
This concurrent resolution extends the deadline for the task force to compile and submit a report from March 2, 2024, to May 31, 2024.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR115

Introduced
1/24/24  
Introduced
1/24/24  
This concurrent resolution extends the due date of the findings and recommendations report of the Delaware Interscholastic Athletic Association Task Force from March 1, 2024, to April 30, 2024.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR116

Introduced
1/24/24  
Introduced
1/24/24  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes February 29, 2024, as "Rare Disease Day" in Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR117

Introduced
2/29/24  
Failed
3/5/24  
Introduced
2/29/24  
This concurrent resolution establishes the Classroom Behavior and School Discipline Task Force.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR118

Introduced
3/6/24  
Introduced
3/6/24  
This resolution recognizes March 7, 2024, as "Delaware Giving Day."
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR119

Introduced
3/5/24  
Introduced
3/5/24  
This concurrent resolution establishes the Student Behavior and School Climate Task Force.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR12

Introduced
3/14/23  
Introduced
3/14/23  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution declares that gun violence is a public health crisis, that ending the gun violence devastating Delaware is a policy priority, and supporting policy and legislative solutions that will make schools safe, confront armed hate and extremism, prevent suicide, and center and support survivors of gun violence.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR120

Introduced
3/14/24  
Introduced
3/14/24  
This Resolution recognizes March 18, 2024, as "National Public Defense Day" in Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR121

Introduced
6/11/24  
Introduced
6/11/24  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution designates the month of June 2024, as "Eating Disorders Awareness and Prevention Month" in Delaware and encourages the Department of Health and Social Services to research methods to raise awareness of, prevent, and treat eating disorders.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR122

Introduced
3/12/24  
Introduced
3/12/24  
This resolution designates the week of March 11 through March 15, 2024, as Civic Learning Week in the State of Delaware to encourage schools and civic organizations to hold educational programs regarding civic duty and urge Delawareans to reflect upon the importance of their civic duty and responsibilities.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR123

Introduced
3/14/24  
Introduced
3/14/24  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes the 100th anniversary of the establishment of diplomatic relations between the United States of America and Ireland.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR124

Introduced
3/14/24  
Introduced
3/14/24  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution designates the Month of March 2024 as March for the Arts in Delaware to recognize the critical role that the arts play in providing a well-rounded education for Delawares youth.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR125

Introduced
3/26/24  
Introduced
3/26/24  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes March 2024, as "Kidney Month" in Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR127

Introduced
3/19/24  
Introduced
3/19/24  
This resolution recognizes the week of March 17 through March 23, 2024, as National Agriculture Week in Delaware
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR128

Introduced
3/21/24  
Introduced
3/21/24  
This Concurrent Resolution recognizes Christian Holy Week and Passover in the State of Delaware.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records