All Bills - Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR129

Introduced
3/26/24  
Introduced
3/26/24  
This Concurrent Resolution designates March 26, 2024, as "Epilepsy Awareness Day" in Delaware and calls upon State agencies and the people of Delaware to undertake suitable efforts to increase epilepsy awareness.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR13

Introduced
3/7/23  
Introduced
3/7/23  
Enrolled
3/8/23  
Engrossed
3/7/23  
This Concurrent Resolution requests the Department of Education conduct a review of mandatory trainings for educators and report back to the General Assembly their findings and recommendations.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR130

Introduced
6/13/24  
Introduced
6/13/24  
This Resolution proclaims June 19, 2024, as "Juneteenth National Independence Day" in Delaware and encourages the people of Delaware to reflect upon the significant roles and many contributions of African Americans, and to celebrate this day with appropriate activities and events.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR131

Introduced
4/23/24  
Introduced
4/23/24  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes May 2024 as "Older Americans Month" in the State of Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR132

Introduced
3/26/24  
Introduced
3/26/24  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution proclaims April 2024 as "Second Chance Month" in the State of Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR133

Introduced
3/26/24  
Introduced
3/26/24  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes March 2024 as "Colorectal Cancer Awareness Month" in the State of Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR134

Introduced
3/26/24  
Introduced
3/26/24  
This resolution recognizes the week of April 7 - 13, 2024 as Delaware Saves Week.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR135

Introduced
3/26/24  
Introduced
3/26/24  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution proclaims Monday, October 28, 2024, as National First Responders Day in the State of Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR136

Introduced
3/27/24  
Introduced
3/27/24  
This Resolution recognizes April 2024 as "Parkinson's Disease Awareness Month" in the State of Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR137

Introduced
3/28/24  
Introduced
3/28/24  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes March 29, 2024, as "National Vietnam War Veterans Day" in Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR138

Introduced
3/26/24  
Introduced
3/26/24  
This Concurrent Resolution recognizes The Delaware Municipal Electric Corporation, known as DEMEC, and community-owned, not-for-profit electric utilities throughout Delaware for their dedication to serving communities with programs that save energy and money, and with renewable projects that lower emissions to benefit the environment. This Resolution also celebrates DEMECs upcoming 45th anniversary and over 100 years of reliable and safe electric service from Delawares local public power utilities by proclaiming March 27, 2024, as "DEMEC Day."
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR139

Introduced
3/28/24  
Introduced
3/28/24  
This resolution designates April 6, 2024, as "National Tartan Day" and commemorates the outstanding achievements and contributions made by Scottish-Americans to the United States.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR14

Introduced
3/14/23  
Introduced
3/14/23  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution designates March 14, 2023, as Pi Day in the State of Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR140

Introduced
3/28/24  
Introduced
3/28/24  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution seeks to preserve the history of the famed World War II Black aviation units making up the Tuskegee Airmen. It also honors the Airmen as a group and names 13 Delawareans who have been identified thus far as having been members of the component units making up the Tuskegee Airmen.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR141

Introduced
4/24/24  
Introduced
4/24/24  
This resolution recognizes April 6 through 12, 2024, as Week of the Young Child in Delaware.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records