All Bills - Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR142
Introduced
4/18/24
Introduced
4/18/24
Engrossed
4/18/24
This Concurrent Resolution observes April 2024, as the "2024 Month of the Military Child" in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR143
Introduced
4/25/24
Introduced
4/25/24
Engrossed
4/25/24
This resolution recognizes April 25, 2024, as "Take Our Children to Work Day."
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR144
Introduced
4/16/24
Introduced
4/16/24
Engrossed
4/16/24
This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes April 2024 as "Child Abuse Prevention Month" in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR145
Introduced
4/18/24
Introduced
4/18/24
Engrossed
4/18/24
This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes April 18, 2024, as "National Line Worker Appreciation Day" in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR146
Introduced
4/23/24
Introduced
4/23/24
Engrossed
4/23/24
This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes the 80th Anniversary of the Sussex Conservation District and its commitment to provide technical guidance and financial assistance to enhance, maintain, protect, and improve land and water resources.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR147
Introduced
4/24/24
Introduced
4/24/24
Engrossed
4/24/24
This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes April 2024 as Limb Loss and Limb Difference Awareness Month in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR148
Introduced
4/25/24
Introduced
4/25/24
Engrossed
4/25/24
This Resolution recognizes May 1, 2024, as "Maternal Mental Health Awareness Day" in Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR149
Introduced
4/25/24
Introduced
4/25/24
Engrossed
4/25/24
This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes April 29 to May 4, 2024, as "Auctioneers Week" in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR15
Introduced
3/16/23
Introduced
3/16/23
Engrossed
3/16/23
This Senate Concurrent Resolution proclaims the month of April 2023 as Sikh Awareness and Appreciation Month in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR150
Introduced
4/25/24
Introduced
4/25/24
Engrossed
4/25/24
This Concurrent Resolution recognizes April 25, 2024, as Sigma Gamma Rho Sorority, Incorporated Delaware Chapters or Sigma Gamma Rho Day at the Capitol in Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR151
Introduced
4/25/24
Introduced
4/25/24
Engrossed
4/25/24
This concurrent resolution recognizes April 29, 2024, as "World Wish Day" in Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR152
Introduced
5/7/24
Introduced
5/7/24
Engrossed
5/7/24
This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes the month of May 2024 as "Healthy Vision Month" in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR153
Introduced
5/7/24
Introduced
5/7/24
Engrossed
5/7/24
This Senate Concurrent Resolution designates May 2024 as "Small Business Month" in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR154
Introduced
5/8/24
Introduced
5/8/24
Engrossed
5/8/24
This resolution recognizes May 11, 2024, as "National Train Day".
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR155
Introduced
5/9/24
Introduced
5/9/24
Engrossed
5/9/24
This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes May 9, 2024, as Delaware Local Government Day in the State of Delaware.