All Bills - Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR156

Introduced
5/16/24  
Introduced
5/16/24  
This resolution requests the Division of Medicaid and Medical Assistance to study and issue a report assessing the home care industry in Delaware. The DMMA is requested to use specified home care codes for their report and conduct various analyses. The DMMA is requested to make their report available for the public.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR157

Introduced
5/9/24  
Introduced
5/9/24  
This resolution designates May 5-11, 2024, as Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week and encourages anyone experiencing uncontrollable, abnormal, and repetitive movements to consult their healthcare provider regarding their symptoms.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR158

Introduced
5/16/24  
Introduced
5/16/24  
This Concurrent Resolution proclaims May 16, 2024, as "Home Care Advocacy Day" in Delaware to recognize the dedication and hard work of caregivers, to emphasize the critical importance of access to quality home care services for Delawares aging residents to live independently and age with dignity, and to advocate for policies and resources that support the delivery of high-quality, person-centered care in the home setting.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR159

Introduced
5/14/24  
Introduced
5/14/24  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution proclaims the month of May 2024 "Cystic Fibrosis Awareness Month" in the State of Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR16

Introduced
3/29/23  
Introduced
3/29/23  
This Concurrent Resolution recognizes March 2023 as "Kidney Month" in Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR160

Introduced
5/23/24  
Introduced
5/23/24  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution designates the month of May 2024 as "Lyme Disease Awareness Month" in the State of Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR161

Introduced
5/16/24  
Introduced
5/16/24  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution designates the week of May 13-17, 2024, as "Charter Schools Week" in the State of Delaware and commends Delaware's public charter schools for their efforts in educating Delaware students.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR163

Introduced
5/23/24  
Introduced
5/23/24  
This Concurrent Resolution designates May 27, 2024, as Brain Cancer Awareness Day in the State of Delaware. Brain Cancer Awareness Day brings attention to the experiences of individuals affected by brain cancer and empowers them to share their stories, which helps overcome stigmas, corrects misconceptions, fosters a supportive community for patients and their families, and helps patients and caregivers to navigate their journey with greater knowledge and support by sharing resources, support networks, and information about available services. Brain Cancer Awareness Day is critical to educating the public about brain cancer and to supporting research funding for effective brain cancer treatments including targeted therapies, immunotherapies, and ultimately a cure.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR164

Introduced
5/14/24  
Introduced
5/14/24  
This resolution designates May 16, 2024, as "Global Accessibility Awareness Day" in the State of Delaware, affirms the importance of making the internet and technology accessible to all, and encourages expanded efforts to keep Delaware residents properly informed about the need for equitable digital access and inclusion.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR165

Introduced
5/16/24  
Introduced
5/16/24  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution proclaims the month of May 2024 as "Community Action Month" in the State of Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR166

Introduced
5/16/24  
Introduced
5/16/24  
This resolution marks May 17, 2024, as the 70th anniversary of the U.S. Supreme Courts landmark decision in the Brown v. Board of Education of Topeka case and honors the courage and fortitude of all who sparked the action leading to the Bulah v. Gebhart and Belton v. Gebhart cases in Delaware. It also recognizes that the work against institutional racism must be continued by all Delawareans.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR167

Introduced
6/11/24  
Introduced
6/11/24  
This Act creates the Study Group to Review and Recommend Compensatory Payments for Certain Tax-Exempt Properties Owned by the State to review and evaluate § 8318 of Title 29 and make recommendations regarding the eligibility criteria that should be used to determine which municipalities to receive compensatory payments for tax-exempt property owned by this State ("compensatory payments"), the amount that should be appropriated for compensatory payments, the formulas used to calculate compensatory payments, and how to periodically review this appropriation, eligibility criteria, and formulas no less than every 10 years.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR168

Introduced
5/21/24  
Introduced
5/21/24  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution designates May 21, 2024, as "Wastewater Management and Drinking Water Management Professionals Day" in the State of Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR169

Introduced
5/21/24  
Introduced
5/21/24  
This resolution recognizes May 22, 2024, as National Maritime Day in the State of Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR17

Introduced
3/29/23  
Introduced
3/29/23  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes March 2023 as "Colorectal Cancer Awareness Month" in the State of Delaware.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records