All Bills - Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR170

Introduced
5/23/24  
Introduced
5/23/24  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution commends the Food Bank of Delaware for its contributions toward ending hunger and resolving the root causes of poverty in the State of Delaware through its increased statewide impact.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR171

Introduced
5/23/24  
Introduced
5/23/24  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution honors the National Conference of State Legislatures, and its members, leadership, and staff, past and present, for its outstanding work as it prepares to mark 50 years of service to the Delaware General Assembly and the legislatures of other U.S. states, territories, and commonwealths.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR172

Introduced
5/23/24  
Introduced
5/23/24  
This resolution recognizes May 23, 2024, as Stop the Bleed Day in Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR173

Introduced
6/25/24  
Introduced
6/25/24  
This Concurrent Resolution designates September 15-21, 2024, as "Adult Education and Family Literacy Week" in the State of Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR174

Introduced
6/12/24  
Introduced
6/12/24  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes the valuable contributions that the Lions Clubs International makes to our local communities, as well as the world at-large, by designating June 12, 2024, as "Delaware State Lions Day" in the State of Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR175

Introduced
6/6/24  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution establishes the Probation System Task Force to study the probation system and make findings and recommendations.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR176

Introduced
6/11/24  
Introduced
6/11/24  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution congratulates the class 2023 Eagle Scouts for having attained the highest rank one can earn in the Boy Scouts of America.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR177

Introduced
6/12/24  
Introduced
6/12/24  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution proclaims Wednesday, June 12, 2024, as Women Veterans Day in the State of Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR178

Introduced
6/11/24  
Introduced
6/11/24  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution designates October 21-27, 2024, as "Free Speech Week" in the State of Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR179

Introduced
6/11/24  
Introduced
6/11/24  
This resolution designates June 12, 2024, as Loving Day in the State of Delaware and reaffirms a commitment to the principles of equality, freedom, and justice for all. Loving Day contributes to building a society that values and respects the fundamental human rights of all individuals, regardless of their race or ethnicity.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR18

Introduced
5/11/23  
Introduced
5/11/23  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes May 11, 2023 as Delaware Local Government Day in the State of Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR180

Introduced
6/11/24  
Introduced
6/11/24  
This Resolution designates October 6, 2024 as a day of Honor for the Marquis de Lafayette in Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR181

Introduced
6/13/24  
Introduced
6/13/24  
This resolution recognizes June 15, 2024, as "Elder Abuse Awareness Day" in Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR182

Introduced
6/12/24  
Introduced
6/12/24  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution designates the week of June 10-16, 2024, as "National Men's Health Week" in the State of Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR183

Introduced
6/13/24  
Introduced
6/13/24  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes September 2024 as "Prostate Cancer Awareness Month" in the State of Delaware.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records