All Bills - Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR198

Introduced
6/25/24  
Introduced
6/25/24  
This resolution recognizes June 2024, as Alzheimer's and Brain Awareness Month and urges all Delawareans to wear purple to help spread awareness of Alzheimer's and all other dementias.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR199

Introduced
6/25/24  
Introduced
6/25/24  
This resolution designates October 9-16, 2024, as Dyspraxia Awareness Week" in the State of Delaware, affirming the importance of widespread awareness and support for individuals with dyspraxia, and encouraging expanded efforts to foster a culture of inclusivity and understanding in Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR2

Introduced
1/11/23  
Introduced
1/11/23  
This Concurrent Resolution recognizes January 9, 2023, as "Law Enforcement Appreciation Day" in the State of Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR20

Introduced
3/16/23  
Introduced
3/16/23  
This resolution recognizes March 25th as Greek Independence Day in Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR200

Introduced
6/25/24  
Introduced
6/25/24  
Because of the serious consequences of the drug overdose epidemic, this Senate Concurrent Resolution respectfully requests a report from the Delaware Department of Education to follow up on the recommendations contained in the 154-page Delaware Drug Prevention Curriculum Task Force Report.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR201

Introduced
6/25/24  
Introduced
6/25/24  
This Concurrent Resolution establishes the Public Education Funding Commission to continue the comprehensive review of public education funding for all students and populations served by district and charter schools, develop a roadmap of recommendations to implement improvements to the public education funding system, and serve as an ongoing body to review the funding annually and recommend updates and changes.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR202

Introduced
6/26/24  
Introduced
6/26/24  
This resolution congratulates the winning teams from the 2024 Delaware High School Mock Trial Program.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR203

Introduced
6/25/24  
Introduced
6/25/24  
This resolution recognizes and affirms the importance of awareness and action on the need for universally accessible housing in Delaware through pending legislation.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR204

Introduced
6/25/24  
Introduced
6/25/24  
This Resolution designates July 26, 2024, as Americans with Disabilities Act Day in the State of Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR205

Introduced
6/26/24  
Introduced
6/26/24  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution directs the Delaware Division of Public Health to develop and release a strategic plan to implement a public health outreach campaign to assess trends, possible messaging, cost of messaging and delivery to communities of need, service needs, resources, and strategies to educate healthcare providers on Alzheimer's Disease and related dementias. In crafting the strategic plan, the Division of Public Health is directed to collaborate with various stakeholders, and the plan must include a strategy for identifying and pursuing federal funding opportunities. Finally, the Division of Public Health is directed to submit the strategic plan to the Governor, all members of the General Assembly, the Controller General, and the Director of the Office of Management and Budget no later than November 1, 2024.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR206

Introduced
6/30/24  
Introduced
6/30/24  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution establishes the Delaware Restoring the Family Unit Task Force.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR21

Introduced
3/27/23  
Engrossed
6/6/23  
Introduced
3/27/23  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution designates June 9, 2023, as "Freshwater Wetlands Day" in the State of Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR22

Introduced
3/28/23  
Introduced
3/28/23  
This resolution designates March 26, 2023, as "Epilepsy Awareness Day" in Delaware and calls upon State agencies and the people of Delaware to undertake suitable efforts to increase epilepsy awareness.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR23

Introduced
3/29/23  
Introduced
3/29/23  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes March 29, 2023, as "National Vietnam War Veterans Day" in Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR24

Introduced
4/5/23  
Introduced
4/5/23  
This resolution recognizes April 2 through 8, 2023, as Week of the Young Child in Delaware.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records