All Bills - Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR25
Introduced
4/4/23
Introduced
4/4/23
Engrossed
4/4/23
This Resolution recognizes April 2023 as "Child Abuse Prevention Month" in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR26
Introduced
4/4/23
Introduced
4/4/23
Engrossed
4/4/23
This Resolution recognizes April 2023 as "Parkinson's Disease Awareness Month" in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR27
Introduced
4/5/23
Introduced
4/5/23
Engrossed
4/5/23
This Concurrent Resolution recognizes Christian Holy Week and Passover in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR28
Introduced
4/6/23
Introduced
4/6/23
Engrossed
4/6/23
This resolution designates April 6, 2023, as "National Tartan Day" and commemorates the outstanding achievements and contributions made by Scottish-Americans to the United States.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR29
Introduced
4/6/23
Introduced
4/6/23
Engrossed
4/6/23
This Senate Concurrent Resolution designates the week of April 9 to April 15, 2003 as "Social Equity Week" in Delaware and urges all citizens of Delaware to participate in activities and events that promote social equity.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR3
Introduced
1/13/23
Engrossed
1/19/23
Introduced
1/13/23
Engrossed
1/19/23
This Senate Concurrent Resolution requests that the Division of Substance Abuse and Mental Health assess the feasibility of replacing the Delaware Psychiatric Centers (DPC) facilities, including gathering input regarding DPCs current and future needs, and provide a report detailing the findings of this work by December 31, 2023.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR30
Introduced
4/6/23
Introduced
4/6/23
Engrossed
4/6/23
This Resolution recognizes April 11-17 2023, as "Black Maternal Health Awareness Week" in Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR31
Introduced
4/25/23
Introduced
4/25/23
Engrossed
4/25/23
This Concurrent Resolution recognizes April 23-29, 2023, as "Crime Victims' Rights Week" in the State of Delaware. The following websites provide more information on Crime Victims' Rights Week and the resources available to victims and survivors of crime:
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR32
Introduced
4/6/23
Introduced
4/6/23
Engrossed
4/6/23
This Senate Concurrent Resolution proclaims April 2023 as "Second Chance Month" in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR33
Introduced
5/4/23
Introduced
5/4/23
Engrossed
5/4/23
This resolution designates the week of May 1-7, 2023, as "Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week" in Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR34
Introduced
4/26/23
Introduced
4/26/23
Engrossed
4/26/23
This resolution congratulates the winning teams from the 2023 Delaware High School Mock Trial Program.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR35
Introduced
4/25/23
Introduced
4/25/23
Engrossed
4/25/23
This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes April 18, 2023 as "National Line Worker Appreciation Day" in the
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR36
Introduced
4/25/23
Introduced
4/25/23
Engrossed
4/25/23
This Concurrent Resolution observes April 2023, as the 2023 Month of the Military Child in the State of Delaware. This Resolution also recognizes the late Colonel Dr. Ronald G. Sarg (USAF, ret.) and his participation and commitment on the MIC3 (Military Interstate Childrens Compact Commission) State Council.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR37
Introduced
4/26/23
Introduced
4/26/23
Engrossed
4/26/23
This concurrent resolution recognizes April 29, 2023, as "World Wish Day" in Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR38
Introduced
4/26/23
Introduced
4/26/23
Engrossed
4/26/23
This Resolution designates April 23-29, 2023, as "Delaware Library Week" in the State of Delaware.