All Bills - Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR52
Introduced
5/10/23
Introduced
5/10/23
Engrossed
5/10/23
This concurrent resolution designates May 2023 as "Lupus Awareness Month" in the State of Delaware and encourages expanded efforts to keep Delaware residents properly informed about Lupus symptom recognition and treatment.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR53
Introduced
5/11/23
Introduced
5/11/23
Engrossed
5/11/23
This Senate Concurrent Resolution commends the Food Bank of Delaware for its contributions towards ending hunger and addressing the root causes or poverty in the State of Delaware through its increased statewide impact.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR54
Introduced
5/11/23
Introduced
5/11/23
Engrossed
5/11/23
The resolution proclaims May 11, 2023, as "Home Care Advocacy Day" in Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR55
Introduced
5/16/23
Introduced
5/16/23
Engrossed
5/16/23
This Senate Concurrent Resolution proclaims May 2023 as "Community Action Month" in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR56
Introduced
5/11/23
Introduced
5/11/23
Engrossed
5/11/23
This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes the advocacy efforts of the youth-led Kick Butts Generation organization.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR57
Introduced
5/16/23
Introduced
5/16/23
Engrossed
5/16/23
This Senate Concurrent Resolution supports a forthcoming federal resolution recognizing Thomas Garrett as a heroic abolitionist.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR58
Introduced
5/18/23
Introduced
5/18/23
Engrossed
5/18/23
This Senate Concurrent Resolution designates the month of May 2023 as "Lyme Disease Awareness Month" in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR59
Introduced
5/17/23
Introduced
5/17/23
Engrossed
5/17/23
This Concurrent Resolution recognizes May 22, 2023 as National Maritime Day in Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR6
Introduced
1/25/23
Introduced
1/25/23
Engrossed
1/25/23
This Senate Concurrent Resolution designates the week of February 27 to March 5, 2023, as "Eating Disorders Awareness and Prevention Week" in Delaware and encourages the Department of Health and Social Services to research methods to raise awareness of, prevent, and treat eating disorders.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR60
Introduced
5/18/23
Introduced
5/18/23
Engrossed
5/18/23
This Senate Concurrent Resolution designates May 25, 2023, as Africa Day in Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR61
Introduced
5/17/23
Introduced
5/17/23
Engrossed
5/17/23
This resolution designates May 18, 2023 as "Global Accessibility Awareness Day" in the State of Delaware, affirms the importance of making the internet and technology accessible to all, and encourages expanded efforts to keep Delaware residents properly informed about the need for equitable digital access and inclusion.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR62
Introduced
5/18/23
Introduced
5/18/23
Engrossed
5/18/23
This Resolution recognizes the contributions of the AmeriHealth Caritas mobile unit to the communities it serves.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR63
Introduced
5/18/23
Introduced
5/18/23
Engrossed
5/18/23
This resolution makes changes to Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 19 in that it adds 2 additional Task Force members, authorizes the Task Force to create subcommittees, allows for the appointment of 1 Task Force member by the Co-Chairs, and changes the dates of the Task Forces' first meeting and the submission of its report.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR64
Introduced
6/15/23
Introduced
6/15/23
Engrossed
6/15/23
This concurrent resolution establishes the Non-Acute Long-Stay Patient Task Force to study and make findings and recommendations regarding the needs and options of non-acute Long-Stay hospital patients in need of transition to a more appropriate care setting. Long-Stay is defined as patients that have been in the hospital for 15 days or more and no longer have an acute medical need warranting hospitalization. These individuals are awaiting transition because access to a more appropriate care setting is unavailable. This means there are individuals in acute medical hospital beds that no longer need to be, but various barriers such as lack of insurance coverage, delayed authorization or guardianship, barriers to admission into behavioral health facilities or long-term care, and more, are preventing them from acute medical hospital discharge. This unnecessarily increases health care costs and can have a negative impact on the patients who are missing out on getting the specialized care they need at a more appropriate care facility. This also means longer wait times for other patients in hospital emergency rooms as there is less bed availability. This concurrent resolution establishes a task force to study and make recommendations on these issues.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR65
Introduced
6/27/23
Introduced
6/27/23
Engrossed
6/27/23
This resolution recognizes July 27, 2023, as "Black Women's Equal Pay Day" in the State of Delaware and encourages all Delawareans to join in recognizing the contributions Black women have made in every aspect of life, and the sacrifices they have made to champion equality.