All Bills - Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR66
Introduced
6/7/23
Introduced
6/7/23
Engrossed
6/7/23
This Senate Concurrent Resolution designates October 16-22, 2023 as "Free Speech Week" in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR67
Introduced
6/7/23
Introduced
6/7/23
Engrossed
6/7/23
This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes November 2023 as "Autoimmune Disease Awareness Month" in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR68
Introduced
6/6/23
Introduced
6/6/23
Engrossed
6/6/23
This resolution proclaims the first full week of June as the "Delaware Gun Violence Prevention Week" in the State of Delaware, in which we remember and honor all survivors of gun violence and ask that all Delawareans consider ways that we as a community can reduce gun violence - including storing all firearms securely.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR69
Introduced
6/6/23
Introduced
6/6/23
Engrossed
6/6/23
This resolution recognizes May 25, 2023, as Stop the Bleed Day in Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR7
Introduced
1/24/23
Introduced
1/24/23
Engrossed
1/24/23
This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes February 28, 2023, as "Rare Disease Day" in Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR70
Introduced
6/15/23
Introduced
6/15/23
Engrossed
6/15/23
This Resolution designates July 26, 2023, as "Americans with Disabilities Act Day" in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR71
Introduced
6/8/23
Introduced
6/8/23
Engrossed
6/8/23
This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes September 2023 as "Prostate Cancer Awareness Month" in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR72
Introduced
6/13/23
Introduced
6/13/23
Engrossed
6/13/23
This Senate Concurrent Resolution congratulates the class 2022 Eagle Scouts for having attained the highest rank one can earn in the Boy Scouts of America.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR73
Introduced
6/13/23
Introduced
6/13/23
Engrossed
6/13/23
This Senate Concurrent Resolution recognizes the importance of community health workers as well as "Community Health Improvement Week" in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR74
Introduced
6/13/23
Introduced
6/13/23
Engrossed
6/13/23
This Senate Concurrent Resolution proclaims Monday, June 12, 2023, as Women Veterans Day in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR75
Introduced
6/15/23
Introduced
6/15/23
Engrossed
6/15/23
This Senate Concurrent Resolution proclaims Saturday, October 28, 2023, as National First Responders Day in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR76
Introduced
6/15/23
Introduced
6/15/23
Engrossed
6/15/23
This resolution honors USO Delaware for their important and inspiring work supporting military members and their families.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR77
Introduced
6/20/23
Introduced
6/20/23
Engrossed
6/20/23
This Senate Concurrent Resolution proclaims Friday, October 6, 2023, as National Coaches Day in the State of Delaware
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR78
Introduced
6/15/23
Introduced
6/15/23
Engrossed
6/15/23
This concurrent resolution establishes the Enhancing Lifelong Community Supports for the Aging, Individuals with Disabilities, and Their Family Caregivers Task Force.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SCR79
Introduced
6/15/23
Introduced
6/15/23
Engrossed
6/15/23
This Concurrent Resolution recognizes the month of June 2023 as Myasthenia Gravis Awareness Month in the State of Delaware.