All Bills - Florida 2022 Regular Session
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H8021
Introduced
2/4/22
Recognizes week of May 1-7, 2022, as "Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week" in Florida.
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H8023
Introduced
2/7/22
Designates January 25, 2022, as "Florida Gulf Coast University Day" in Florida.
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H8025
Introduced
2/8/22
Designates February 9, 2022, as "FSU Day" in Florida.
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H8027
Introduced
2/11/22
Designates February 15, 2022, as "Gator Day."
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H8029
Introduced
2/11/22
Recognizes April 2022 as "Springs Protection Awareness Month."
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H8031
Introduced
2/11/22
Celebrates the 75th anniversary of Everglades National Park.
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H8033
Introduced
2/11/22
Congratulates Eastern Florida State College Women's Soccer Team for winning 2021 NJCAA Division I Women's Soccer Championship.
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H8035
Introduced
2/11/22
Recognizes 2022 as "The Year of Water Skiing."
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H8037
Introduced
2/14/22
Recognizes Tampa Bay Lightning.
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H8039
Introduced
2/18/22
Designates March 2022 as "Women's History Month."
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H8041
Introduced
2/18/22
Recognizes June as "Caribbean Heritage Month."
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H8043
Introduced
2/18/22
Designates April 23, 2022, as "Trails Day."
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H8045
Introduced
2/18/22
Acknowledges contributions made to people of this state by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., & recognizes February 20, 2022, as 28th annual "Delta Days at Capitol."
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H8047
Introduced
2/18/22
Designates February 2022 as "VATER Syndrome Awareness Month."
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H8049
Introduced
2/18/22
Designates February 24, 2022, as "FAMU Day."