All Bills - Florida 2022 Regular Session
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1974
Introduced
2/4/22
Passed
2/10/22
Recognizing the week of April 24 through May 1, 2022, as the "Days of Remembrance" and April 28, 2022, as "Holocaust Remembrance Day" in Florida, etc.
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1976
Introduced
2/7/22
Passed
2/23/22
Recognizing and commending Moffitt Cancer Center on the occasion of its 35th anniversary, etc.
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1978
Introduced
2/11/22
Passed
2/17/22
Expressing appreciation for the remarkable contributions made to the people of this state by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., and recognizing February 20, 2022, as the 28th annual "Delta Day at the Capitol", etc.
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1980
Introduced
2/11/22
Passed
3/8/22
Recognizing April 4-8, 2022, as "Food Waste Prevention Week" in Florida, etc.
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1982
Introduced
2/15/22
Passed
3/3/22
Recognizing March 2022 as "Triple-Negative Breast Cancer Awareness Month" and March 3, 2022, as "Triple-Negative Breast Cancer Awareness Day" in Florida, etc.
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1984
Introduced
2/21/22
Passed
3/2/22
Recognizing February 15, 2022, as "Gator Day" in Florida, etc.
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1986
Introduced
2/23/22
Passed
3/3/22
Recognizing 2022 as the "Year of Artemis" in Florida to acknowledge the launch of the Artemis I mission and the beginning of a new era in deep space exploration, etc.
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1988
Introduced
2/25/22
Passed
3/3/22
Recognizing the Juvenile Welfare Board of Pinellas County, etc.
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1990
Introduced
2/28/22
Passed
3/1/22
Condemning the ruthless military assault on Ukraine, and on democracy itself, by Russian President Vladimir Putin and expressing unwavering support for the Ukrainian people in this extraordinary time, etc.
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1992
Introduced
2/28/22
Passed
3/8/22
Remembering former United States Congresswoman Carrie P. Meek and honoring her legacy of leadership, advocacy, and public service and her countless contributions to this state, etc.
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1994
Introduced
3/1/22
Passed
3/9/22
Recognizing the 117th anniversary of Rotary International, etc.
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1996
Introduced
3/2/22
Recognizing March 2022 as "Rare Kidney Disease Awareness Month" in Florida
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1998
Introduced
3/3/22
Passed
3/9/22
Recognizing the Olympic achievements of Ocala athletes Erin Jackson, Brittany Bowe, and Joey Mantia, etc.
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S2000
Introduced
3/9/22
Passed
3/11/22
Honoring La Gaceta, one of the oldest minority-owned and -focused newspapers, and the only trilingual newspaper in the United States, for 100 years of continued service to Florida's Latino community, etc.
FL
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S2002
Introduced
3/10/22
Passed
3/11/22
Engrossed
3/11/22
Passed
3/11/22
Enrolled
3/11/22
Passed
3/11/22
Extending the 2022 Regular Session of the Florida Legislature under the authority of Section 3(d), Article III of the State Constitution, etc.