All Bills - Florida 2025 Regular Session
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1856
Introduced
3/11/25
Passed
3/12/25
Recognizing and celebrating the life and legacy of Senator Geraldine F. "Geri" Thompson, etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1858
Introduced
3/17/25
Passed
3/19/25
Commending Florida State University for its achievements as a national leader in academic and research excellence and designating March 19, 2025, as FSU Day at the Capitol, etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1860
Introduced
3/18/25
Passed
3/27/25
Recognizing March 27, 2025, as "Keiser University Day" in Florida and celebrating the university's nearly 50 years of providing quality education, serving a diverse student population, and positively impacting both this state and the global economy, etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1862
Introduced
3/20/25
Passed
3/27/25
Designating March 25, 2025, as "Florida Gulf Coast University Day" in Florida, etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1864
Introduced
3/25/25
Passed
3/27/25
Recognizing the women of the 6888th Central Postal Directory Battalion for their unwavering service to the United States Army and its personnel during World War II, etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1866
Introduced
3/27/25
Passed
4/23/25
Commending the State Government Affairs Council on the occasion of its 50th anniversary and recognizing the organization's tireless work nationwide in advocating for sound policy decisions, transparency, and good governance at the state level, etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1868
Introduced
3/31/25
Passed
4/3/25
Designating April 2, 2025, as "Independent Online Sellers Day" in Florida, etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1870
Introduced
4/7/25
Passed
4/9/25
Commending Tallahassee State College for its consistent excellence and ongoing commitment to student success and recognizing April 10, 2025, as "Tallahassee State College Day" at the Capitol, etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1872
Introduced
4/7/25
Passed
4/29/25
Recognizing the contributions made by Harris Rosen to the Central Florida community, etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1874
Introduced
4/8/25
Passed
5/1/25
Designating May 1, 2025, as "Prader-Willi Syndrome Awareness Day" in Florida and expressing continued support for groundbreaking research that is improving the quality of life of individuals in this state who have the disorder and their families, etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1876
Introduced
4/8/25
Passed
4/9/25
Recognizing Florida Agricultural and Mechanical University's contributions as an outstanding institution of higher education and designating April 9, 2025, as "FAMU Day" in Florida, etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1878
Introduced
4/8/25
Passed
4/23/25
Honoring the life and legacy of University of South Florida Head Basketball Coach Amir Abdur-Rahim, his many accomplishments, and his contributions to the Tampa Bay community and this state, etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1880
Introduced
4/8/25
Passed
4/16/25
Encouraging financial institutions in Florida to commit to fighting human trafficking, etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1882
Introduced
4/9/25
Passed
4/29/25
Recognizing April 2025 as "Springs Protection Awareness Month" in Florida, etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1884
Introduced
4/10/25
Passed
4/23/25
Recognizing the 100th anniversary of the Town of Windermere and its commitment to building and maintaining a strong community that reflects its residents, and recognizing February 2, 2025, as "Town of Windermere Day" in Florida, etc.