All Bills - Florida 2025 Regular Session
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1886
Introduced
4/11/25
Passed
4/15/25
Commending the University of South Florida for its achievements as a national leader in academic and research excellence and designating April 15, 2025, as "USF Day" at the Capitol, etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1888
Introduced
4/14/25
Recognizing April 23, 2025, as "National Association of Women Business Owners Day" in Florida, etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1890
Introduced
4/17/25
Passed
4/23/25
Designating August 9, 2025, as "Bob Graham Day" in the State of Florida, etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1892
Introduced
4/21/25
Passed
4/23/25
Affirming the importance of the Florida Wildlife Corridor and its significant environmental, cultural, economic, and tourism value as a unique natural resource and recognizing April 22, 2025, as "Florida Wildlife Corridor Day", etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1894
Introduced
4/22/25
Passed
4/30/25
Recognizing the importance of Japanese business, trade, and cultural cooperation with the State of Florida and the state's diplomatic, business, and cultural ties with Japan, etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1896
Introduced
4/23/25
Designating August 2025 as "Muscogee (Creek) Nation Heritage Month" in Florida, etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1898
Introduced
4/24/25
Passed
4/30/25
Recognizing April 23, 2025, as "National Association of Women Business Owners Day" in Florida, etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1900
Introduced
4/24/25
Passed
4/28/25
Recognizing the accomplishments and contributions to this state and to the nation of United States Army Command Sergeant Major Shane W. Shorter, Command Senior Enlisted Leader of the United States Special Operations Command at MacDill Air Force Base in Tampa, etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1902
Introduced
4/24/25
Passed
4/28/25
Recognizing and honoring the accomplishments and contributions to this state and to the nation of United States Army General Bryan P. Fenton, 13th Commander of the United States Special Operations Command at MacDill Air Force Base in Tampa, etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S2500
Introduced
4/3/25
Engrossed
4/9/25
Refer
4/9/25
Providing moneys for the annual period beginning July 1, 2025, and ending June 30, 2026, and supplemental appropriations for the period ending June 30, 2025, to pay salaries, and other expenses, capital outlay - buildings, and other improvements, and for other specified purposes of the various agencies of state government, etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S2502
Introduced
4/3/25
Engrossed
4/9/25
Refer
4/9/25
Authorizing the Agency for Health Care Administration, in consultation with the Department of Health, to submit a budget amendment to realign funding for specified purposes; extending for 1 fiscal year the exemption of certain rules pertaining to the medical use of marijuana from certain rulemaking requirements; revising the Quality Incentive Program payment pool percentage for the reimbursement of Medicaid providers; requiring the Department of Children and Families to develop and report on an alternative tiered funding methodology and to provide certain information, etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S2504
Introduced
4/3/25
Engrossed
4/9/25
Refer
4/9/25
Providing for the resolution of collective bargaining issues at impasse between the state and certified bargaining units for state employees, etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S2506
Introduced
4/3/25
Engrossed
4/9/25
Refer
4/9/25
Revising requirements for applications for full fee simple acquisition projects; revising the entities that certain state agencies may contract with; revising the scoring system for assessing project eligibility for inclusion in the statewide flooding and sea-level rise plan; revising the schedule for the distribution of funds from the Indian Gaming Revenue Clearing Trust Fund within the Department of Financial Services, etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S2508
Introduced
4/3/25
Engrossed
4/9/25
Refer
4/9/25
Increasing the number of circuit judges in certain judicial circuits; increasing the number of county court judges in certain counties; increasing the number of judges in a certain district court of appeal, etc.
FL
Florida 2025 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S2510
Introduced
4/3/25
Engrossed
4/9/25
Authorizing a school district to report a full-time equivalent student for credit earned by a student who is enrolled in a virtual instruction course during the summer; deleting language providing that students who earn certain career and professional education (CAPE) certificates are eligible for full-time equivalent membership; revising the CAPE Industry Certification Funding List; revising the procedure for the calculation of additional full-time equivalent membership for certain students, etc.