All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1038
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/19/25
Refer
3/19/25
Adds a definition for "specified data element" and expands the definition of "personal information". Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1039
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Authorizes the Department of Health to adopt, by rule, any federal regulations as they existed on 1/1/2025, relating to the protection, preservation, care, and improvement of the physical and mental health of the people of the State that it deems to be in the public interest.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB104
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/16/25
Report Pass
2/7/25
Refer
2/7/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/13/25
Refer
3/13/25
Report Pass
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
Report Pass
4/4/25
Beginning 7/1/2026, restricts the use of restrictive housing in state-operated and state-contracted correctional facilities, with certain specified exceptions. Establishes a restrictive housing legislative working group to develop and recommend more comprehensive laws, policies, and procedures regarding restrictive housing for members of vulnerable populations by 1/8/2027. Requires the Hawaii Correctional System Oversight Commission to review restrictive housing placements on an annual basis. Authorizes the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, by 12/1/2027, to implement policies and procedures recommended by the restrictive housing working group related to committed persons. Requires interim and final reports to the Legislature and Hawaii Correctional System Oversight Commission. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1040
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/14/25
Refer
3/14/25
Requires the Office of Wellness and Resilience to conduct a study on the cost and feasibility of establishing a program to acquire and forgive medical debt owed by certain households in the State. Requires a report to the Legislature. Effective 12/31/2050. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1041
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Requires the Department of Health to develop a service availability form to be completed by covered entities to convey to patients and the public certain health care services unavailable at the entity before 12/1/2026, and to publish and maintain on its website a list of covered entities and the service availability form submitted by each covered entity before 02/1/2027. Requires the Department of Health to adopt rules, including a process for receiving and investigating complaints and assessing fines against covered entities in violation. Requires each covered entity to submit a completed service availability form to the Department of Health, adopt certain relevant policies by 2/1/2027, provide patients with their current service availability form as part of the informed consent process before initiating a health care service, and maintain a record of the patient's receipt of the form beginning 2/1/2027. Establishes penalties.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1042
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Engrossed
2/28/25
Refer
3/4/25
Report Pass
3/18/25
Refer
3/18/25
Report Pass
4/4/25
Establishes a two-year Mental Health Emerging Therapies Pilot Program within the Office of Wellness and Resilience. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1043
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/19/25
Refer
3/19/25
Reduces the general excise tax rate imposed on nonprescription drugs by one half. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1044
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/7/25
Refer
2/7/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/18/25
Refer
3/18/25
Report Pass
4/4/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Expands the powers of the Hawaii Property Insurance Association and reactivates the Hawaii Hurricane Relief Fund to help stabilize the property insurance market in the State. Establishes the Condominium Loan Program and the Condominium Loan Revolving Fund, to be administered by the Hawaii Green Infrastructure Authority on behalf of the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism, for the purpose of providing financing for essential repairs and deferred maintenance to condominium associations. Abolishes the Condominium Loan Revolving Fund on 6/30/2047. Establishes the Condominium Loan Loss Reserves Program to incentivize lenders to provide loans at competitive rates and terms to allow condominium associations to make necessary maintenance and repairs. Requires the Insurance Commissioner to conduct a study to develop long-term solutions to help stabilize the property insurance market in the State. Requires reports to the Legislature. Authorizes the issuance of reimbursable general obligation bonds to facilitate the initial issuance of policies to condominium associations. Appropriates funds. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1045
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Transfers the Hawaii Broadband and Digital Equity Office from the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to the Department of Accounting and General Services. Transfers the broadband duties of the Director of Commerce and Consumer Affairs to the Hawaii Broadband and Digital Equity Office. Creates a Hawaii Broadband Infrastructure Special Fund. Disbands the Hawaii Broadband Assistance Advisory Council. Requires the Information Technology Steering Committee to oversee and manage public advanced communications technology infrastructure. Appropriates moneys.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1046
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Requires certain managing agents to notify each unit owner and the Real Estate Commission when a condominium association that the agent manages fails to meet budget and replacement reserves reporting requirements. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1047
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Appropriates funds to the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation for purchasing body cameras for adult correctional officers to wear while on duty at state correctional facilities.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1048
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
Report Pass
4/4/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Amends Act 205, SLH 2024, to clarify standards and safeguards in online crowdfunding, including creating separate registration, reporting, and fee requirements that are specific to platform charities and charitable fundraising platforms. Extends the effective date of Act 205 to July 1, 2026. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1049
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Establishes the Parkinson's Disease Research Collection Database to be administered by the Department of Health, to house a collection of data on the incidence of Parkinson's disease in the State. Establishes the Parkinson's Disease Research Collection Database Advisory Committee. Requires the Department to create a Parkinson's disease research collection database webpage by 1/1/2026, and submit annual reports to the Legislature.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB105
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/16/25
Repeals staff of the legislative branch of the State from the list of individuals not included in any appropriate bargaining unit. Specifies that the President of the Senate and the Speaker of the House of Representatives shall each have one vote if they have employees in a particular bargaining unit for the purposes of negotiating a collective bargaining agreement.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1050
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Allows captive insurance companies that are not risk retention captive insurance companies to apply to the Insurance Commissioner for certificates of exemption from examination after meeting certain requirements. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)