All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1051
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/13/25
Refer
3/13/25
Report Pass
3/31/25
Designates September as Hawaiian History Month. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1052
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Reduces the offense of purchasing, possessing, setting off, igniting, or discharging aerial devices, display fireworks, or articles pyrotechnic under a weight of twenty-five pounds without a valid permit to a civil violation.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1053
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Establishes a refundable child tax credit. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2025.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1054
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
By 1/1/2027, requires the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations to establish a family and medical leave insurance program and begin collecting payroll contributions to finance payment of benefits. By 1/1/2028, requires the Department to start receiving claims and paying benefits under the program. Specifies eligibility requirements and employee protections under the program.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1055
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Requires the Department of Human Services to adjust the minimum certification periods for Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program benefits households, participate in the Elderly Simplified Application Project, and report to the Legislature. Appropriates funds to the Department of Human Services to improve Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program rates, including establishing additional positions.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1056
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Restricts how much and how often a landlord may increase rent over the course of a twelve month period.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1057
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Clarifies that the bid incentive given to bidders for public works construction projects who are parties to an apprenticeship agreement is based on apprenticeable trades utilized, rather than employed, to construct the public works. Requires the bidder and the bidder's subcontractors to be parties to all apprenticeable trades utilized to construct the project for which a state-approved apprenticeship program exists. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1058
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Increases the state supplemental payment ceilings for type I adult residential care homes, licensed developmental disabilities domiciliary homes, community care foster family homes, certified adult foster homes, and type II adult residential care homes. Authorizes an additional payment for resident clients residing in these homes when state funds for the state supplemental payment for a specific fiscal year are not fully expended, under certain circumstances.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1059
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Lowers the minimum age that a certified caregiver for an adult foster home must be from twenty-one to eighteen.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB106
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/16/25
Report Pass
2/10/25
Refer
2/10/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/20/25
Refer
3/20/25
Report Pass
4/4/25
Establishes a three-year Pedestrian Safety Pilot Program in a county with population of two hundred fifty thousand or less, under certain conditions. Authorizes the Governor to revoke and abolish the Pilot Program and overturn a county's request to opt-out of the Pilot Program. Authorizes a county with a population of over two hundred fifty thousand to participate in the Pilot Program, subject to certain conditions. Requires reports to the Legislature. Requires a driver of a vehicle to yield to a pedestrian when the pedestrian clearly indicates their intention to cross a roadway within a crosswalk. Sunsets 6/30/2028. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD2)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1060
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Increases the state supplemental payment ceilings for type I adult residential care homes, licensed developmental disabilities domiciliary homes, community care foster family homes, certified adult foster homes, and type II adult residential care homes.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1061
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/13/25
Refer
2/13/25
Establishes and appropriates funds for a digital navigator pilot program to offer technical assistance with computers and electronic devices for the members of the public Requires a report to the Legislature. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1062
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Transfers the Hawaii Broadband and Digital Equity Office from the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to the Office of Enterprise Technology Services in the Department of Accounting and General Services. Establishes the Hawaii Broadband and Digital Equity Special Fund. Appropriates funds.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1063
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Allows newly graduated high school students to be eligible for workers' compensation coverage during the summer following their high school graduation while participating in Department of Education-sponsored work-based learning programs.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1064
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Prohibits persons from operating a medical cannabis dispensary or cultivating cannabis without a license from the Department of Health. Prohibits individuals from providing certain services to individuals engaging in unlicensed cannabis operations. Requires the Department of Health to send a cease and desist notice to violators. Establishes criminal penalties. Establishes an affirmative defense for, and a conclusive basis for certain violations. Establishes exceptions. Establishes a cannabis cultivator license to authorize the cultivation and distribution of cannabis plants. Requires the Department of Health to only issue one cannabis cultivator license for each person. Establishes limits on: (1) the number of cannabis cultivator licenses the Department of Health may issue; (2) the maximum size of plant canopy for indoor and outdoor cultivations for each cannabis cultivator license; and (3) the maximum plant count of mature cannabis plants for each cannabis cultivator license. Authorizes expenditures from the Medical Cannabis Registry and Regulation Special Fund to fund programs for the mitigation and abatement of nuisances relating to chapter 329D, HRS. Appropriates funds out of the Medical Cannabis Registry and Regulation Special Fund for the Department of Attorney General to enforce, and mitigate nuisances relating to, chapter 329D, HRS. Effective 12/31/2050. (SD2)