All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1119
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Amends the Hawaii Motor Vehicle Industry Licensing Act by adding the definition of common entity and expanding the definition of sale or selling. Allows a licensed dealer or distributor to protest before the board for damages against another dealer or distributor. Establishes a dispute resolution process for manufacturers and distributors to contest the accuracy of a dealer's reimbursement for parts and labor.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB112
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/16/25
Report Pass
2/5/25
Refer
2/5/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/27/25
Enrolled
3/28/25
Chaptered
4/11/25
Passed
4/11/25
Allows surviving immediate family members of deceased persons for whom law enforcement initiated an investigation to receive a copy of the closing report prepared by the investigating police department after a specified period of time. (SD2)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1120
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/11/25
Refer
2/11/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/13/25
Refer
3/13/25
Report Pass
3/20/25
Refer
3/20/25
Report Pass
4/3/25
Requires the Department of Transportation to conduct a feasibility study on implementing a clean fuel standard for alternative fuels in the State. Requires, no later than 1/1/2028, the Department of Transportation to adopt rules governing a clean fuel standard for alternative fuels in the State. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1121
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Beginning 1/1/2027, establishes a preference in the Hawaii Public Procurement Code that favors bids or offers from businesses that intend to use a higher proportion of allelectric construction vehicles in Department of Transportation construction projects.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1122
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Administratively attaches the State Highway Safety and Modernization Council to the Department of Transportation. Allows council members to appoint their designees. Updates membership of the Council.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1123
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/11/25
Refer
2/11/25
Requires the State Highway Modernization and Safety Council to conduct a thorough evaluation of vehicle characteristics and develop a set of standards to identify high-risk vehicles. Requires a report to the Legislature.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1124
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Establishes the retail delivery safety fee of 50 cents to be imposed on a retailer for each transaction involving a non-food item retail delivery in the State. Allows the retailer to transfer the fee to the purchaser. Creates certain exemptions. Requires the Director of Taxation to deposit the collected fees into the Safe Routes to School Program Special Fund. Allows the Director of Taxation to deposit collected fees that cover the administration of the retail delivery safety fee into the state general fund. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1125
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Establishes an Early Learning Cooperative Program within the Department of Human Services. Establishes an Advisory Council to advise on the goals of the Early Learning Cooperative Program. Requires the Department of Human Services to secure federal funding through the Child Care and Development Block Grant for the administration of the Early Learning Cooperative Program. Requires the Department of Human Services to adopt administrative rules. Requires annual reports to the Legislature. Appropriates funds.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1126
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Prohibits civil asset forfeiture unless the covered offense is a felony for which the property owner has been convicted. Excludes the forfeiture proceedings for an animal pending criminal charges. Requires the Attorney General to deposit the net proceeds of the forfeited property to the credit of the state general fund.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1127
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist Hawaii Island Community Health Center to purchase or lease land on the island of Hawaii and develop primary care health care facilities.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1128
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/10/25
Refer
2/10/25
Establishes requirements for insurers relating to claims for additional living expenses under homeowners insurance policies, including situations where losses are incurred during a state of emergency. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1129
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/10/25
Refer
2/10/25
Requires the Insurance Commissioner to convene a working group to identify, assess, and recommend certain risk transfer market mechanisms. Requires annual report to the Legislature. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB113
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/16/25
Provides that the Liquor Commission or other licensing agency of each county shall deny the renewal of certain current liquor licenses upon receipt of sufficient protests.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1130
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/7/25
Refer
2/7/25
Exempts from the state general excise tax the sales and gross proceeds from sales of construction rebuilding materials for residential and commercial properties in federally declared disaster areas. Applies only to rebuilding materials purchased between 7/1/2025 and 12/31/2028. Requires a third party to issue the certification for projects qualifying for the exemption for disaster construction rebuilding materials. Sunsets on 12/31/2028. Effective 1/1/2026. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1131
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Imposes an excise tax on certain hedge funds failing to dispose of excess single-family residences, escalating over a ten-year period. Imposes a tax on any newly acquired single-family residences by a hedge fund. Makes certain exemptions. Requires the Department of Taxation to establish a certification process to ensure buyers of homes sold by hedge funds are not major investors in residential real estate. Establishes the Housing Down Payment Trust Fund to be administered by the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation to provide grants to establish new or supplement existing programs that provide down payment assistance to families purchasing homes within the State. Allocates collected tax revenue and penalties paid by hedge funds to the Housing Down Payment Trust Fund. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2025.