All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1132
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Requires the Department of Accounting and General Services to identify all state-owned buildings that have the space and capability to establish a child care center on its premises and establish and administer child care centers within the identified state-owned buildings, and procure a child care provider licensed under State law as an operator of the child care centers. Beginning 1/1/2026, requires bids for state building construction and major state building renovation projects to include a designated area for a child care center. Requires a report to the Legislature.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1133
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Refer
1/31/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Authorizes certain counties to establish a rental unit price ceiling ordinance that prohibits a landlord from increasing the rental price of a dwelling unit at a rate that exceeds the percentage calculated and published by the county based on changes in the applicable Consumer Price Index. Beginning 8/1/2025, requires certain counties to annually calculate and publish the maximum rate at which a landlord may increase the rental price of a dwelling unit during the immediately succeeding twelve-month period. Establishes a nonrefundable Long-Term Residential Lease Tax Credit for taxpayers who own and lease a dwelling unit located in a county that has adopted a rental unit price ceiling ordinance to a person as the person's principal residence in the State pursuant to a lease agreement of a term of one year or longer. Allows the tax credit to be carried forward for up to three taxable years. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2025. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1134
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Requires certain landlords to provide a specified notice to a tenant regarding the tenant's potential right to purchase the property, under certain conditions. Allows tenants, families, local governments, affordable housing nonprofits, and community land trusts forty-five days to match or beat the best bona fide offer to buy an eligible affordable housing property.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1135
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Prohibit sellers of foreclosed homes from bundling properties at a public sale and requires each foreclosed home to be sold separately. Specifies that the sale of a foreclosed property is not final until either fifteen days after the public sale or forty-five days if an eligible bidder submits a subsequent bid or written notice of intent to submit a subsequent bid.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1136
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Establishes ratemaking regulations for insurers who base their rates on a policyholder or applicant's wildfire risk. Amends the definition of "prospective loss costs" to incorporate catastrophe modeling instead of historical aggregate losses. Prohibits insurers from basing certain insurance rates on past loss experience within or outside the State. Requires insurers to provide a list of items that may be covered under a homeowners insurance policy issued or renewed on or after 1/1/2026, as additional living expenses when a claim for additional living expenses is made. If a loss relating to a state of emergency occurs, requires coverage for additional living expenses for a period of not less than 24 months from the loss, subject to other policy provisions. Requires that coverage for additional living expenses not limit a policyholder's right to recovery if the insured home is made uninhabitable by a covered peril and allows an insurer to provide a reasonable alternative remedy that addresses the property condition that precludes reasonable habitation of the insured premises. Requires additional living expenses coverage for at least 2 weeks for certain losses incurred if a state of emergency is accompanied by an order of civil authority restricting access to the home. Beginning on 1/1/2026, requires each newly issued or renewed homeowners insurance policy that covers a property within the State to provide for the replacement cost value of the insured property. Amends the determination of over insurance under section 431:l0E-102, HRS.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1137
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Beginning 1/1/2026, requires insurers to notify policyholders of rate changes at least 30 days before the effective date of the rate change. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1138
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Requires health plan insurers to align their prior authorization processes with Medicare policies.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1139
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Directs the Department of Human Services to adopt rules to expand Medicaid eligibility to all children in the State from birth to age 5 years without regard to household income. Appropriates moneys.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB114
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/16/25
Report Pass
2/6/25
Refer
2/6/25
Beginning 6/1/2026, establishes presidential preference primary elections for the 2028 election cycle. Appropriates funds. Effective 4/23/2057. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1140
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/10/25
Refer
2/10/25
Establishes the Fair Access to Insurance Requirements (FAIR) Program, which shall be established in and administered by the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs to ensure that residents in high-risk areas can purchase affordable and comprehensive property insurance coverage for their residential properties. Authorizes the Director of Commerce and Consumer Affairs to issue revenue bonds in amounts authorized by the Legislature, in which case the Premium Stabilization Fund shall be established by the Director. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1141
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Requires insurers offering homeowners insurance policies to comply with certain minimum requirements in cases of losses of owner-occupied residences due to a catastrophic disaster. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1142
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
Report Pass
4/4/25
Requires mortgage servicers to comply with certain requirements regarding the disbursement of insurance proceeds for residential real estate that has been destroyed or damaged. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1143
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Requires annual submission of an updated tourism functional plan by the Hawaiian Tourism Authority, subject to available funding.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1144
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Requires transient accommodations brokers and any other persons or entities to offer, list, advertise, or display a transient accommodations rental rate that includes all resort fees required for the furnishing of transient accommodations. Requires transient accommodations brokers and any other persons or entities to include all applicable taxes and fees imposed by a government on the stay in the total price to be paid before the consumer reserves the furnishing of transient accommodations. Establishes penalties. Effective 1/1/2026.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1145
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Requires bike owners to pay an annual registration fee each year.