All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1227
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Beginning 1/1/2026, requires contracts for services awarded to community-based organizations by the Department of Health, Department of Human Services, or Judiciary in support of fulfilling their statutory mandates to individuals, families, and communities in the State to include certain protections against inflation. Appropriates funds to the Department of Health, Department of Human Services, and Judiciary to increase the contract price in existing contracts for certain services provided by community-based organizations in support of fulfilling their statutory mandates to individuals, families, and communities in the State.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1228
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Establishes a working group for legal services for youth in the child welfare system within the Judiciary. Requires a report to the Legislature. Appropriates funds for the working group. Effective 12/31/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1229
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/10/25
Refer
2/10/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/18/25
Refer
3/18/25
Report Pass
4/3/25
Extends the Dwelling Unit Revolving Fund Equity Pilot Program to 6/30/2030. Gives preference to for-sale housing development projects developed under governmental assistance programs approved by the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB123
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/17/25
Report Pass
2/10/25
Refer
2/10/25
Eliminates the home mortgage interest deduction for second homes under Hawaii income tax law. Requires reports to the Legislature. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1230
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/11/25
Refer
2/11/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Exempts the donation of wild game meat, including axis deer, by a hunter for the use or distribution by a charitable, religious, or nonprofit organization to needy persons from certain laws regarding the inspection and transportation of meat. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1231
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
4/2/25
Enrolled
4/16/25
Repeals the Uniform Parentage Act of 1973 and updates laws relating to parentage, including enacting portions of the Uniform Parentage Act of 2017. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1232
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/11/25
Refer
2/11/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/14/25
Refer
3/14/25
Report Pass
3/20/25
Refer
3/20/25
Establishes a 3-year New Wastewater Technology Testing Pilot Program within the University of Hawaii Water Resources Research Center to test and evaluate new wastewater technology systems. Requires reports to the Legislature. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1233
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/10/25
Refer
2/10/25
Establishes within the Department of Human Resources Development the State Internship and Workforce Development Program. Establishes positions within the Department. Appropriates funds. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1234
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/11/25
Refer
2/11/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Authorizes executive and administrative departments and agencies to enter into intergovernmental and partnership agreements with private sector entities, nonprofit organizations, and other governmental bodies. Requires an annual report to the Legislature. Effective 5/13/2040. (SD2)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1235
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Establishes within the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation the Government Employee Housing Program. Establishes the Government Employee Housing Revolving Fund. Clarifies eligibility for the Government Housing Revolving Fund and Government Employee Housing Program. Appropriates funds. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1236
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Specifies that the works of art special fund's one per cent transfer requirement shall apply only to capital improvement appropriations for the original construction of state buildings. Amends the authority for funds from the works of art special fund to be used only for costs related to the acquisition of works of art. Appropriates funds.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1237
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Repeals state restrictions on the installation and use of sun screening devices, including window tinting, on motor vehicles.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1238
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Proposes to amend the Constitution of the State of Hawaii to provide that if a United States census shows that the state Native Hawaiian population decreased by no less than 5% since the prior United States census, all state legislators in office at the time of the release of the latter census shall be ineligible to serve in any state legislative office for 1 term, which shall be the 1st term of the applicable legislative office that begins after the release of the latter census.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1239
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Prohibits the use of potable water to irrigate golf courses subject to certain exceptions. Defines potable water.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB124
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/17/25
Report Pass
2/6/25
Refer
2/6/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Enrolled
3/10/25
Proposes a constitutional amendment to specify that reapportionment shall be based on the resident population, as counted in the decennial United States census for the respective reapportionment year, rather than the permanent resident population. (SD1)