All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1240
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Increases the number of voter service centers in the State. Requiring all voter services centers to operate during the same days and hours statewide. Clarifies that during each day of operation, during all hours of operation, each voter service center is to provide in-person voter registration, receive absentee and election-by-mail ballots, allow voters to vote in person, and provide voting machine services for persons with disabilities. Appropriates moneys to the counties for the administrative costs of voter service centers.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1241
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Establishes general excise tax exemptions for various medical services, including dental services.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1242
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Requires and appropriates moneys for the establishment of a 5-year nurse recertification pilot program to be administered by the Department of Health. Requires reports to the Legislature. Appropriates moneys for the Department of Health to award scholarships to eligible nursing students who agree to teach nursing in Hawaii after graduating.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1243
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/10/25
Refer
2/10/25
Allows foreign medical school graduates applying for a license to practice medicine and surgery to substitute one year of required medical training or experience in a hospital with one year of fellowship training where the parent program or hospital is accredited by the Accreditation Council for Graduate Medical Education. Effective 12/31/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1244
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Refer
1/28/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Allows for a percentage of general excise and fuel taxes generated by the counties to be used for maintenance of private roadways that are open to the public. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1245
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/11/25
Refer
2/11/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
Report Pass
4/4/25
Report Pass
4/24/25
Report Pass
4/24/25
Beginning 7/1/2026, mandates reimbursement for services provided by participating registered pharmacists practicing within their scope of practice by private and public health plans in the State and requires the health plans to recognize pharmacists licensed in the State as participating providers. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1246
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/11/25
Refer
2/11/25
Directs the Department of Health to purchase and store a 1 year supply of mifepristone by working with 1 or more pharmacies in the State. Appropriates funds. Effective 12/31/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1247
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds to the Agricultural Development Corporation for the purchase of an agricultural parcel for agricultural development. Establishes one full-time equivalent (1.0 FTE) Hawaii Island Property Manager position within the ADC. Appropriates funds.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1248
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/13/25
Refer
2/13/25
Establishes that, in certain circumstances, an actor rightfully present on agricultural lands may exercise deadly force with a right to stand the actor's ground and not retreat.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1249
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/13/25
Refer
2/13/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/14/25
Refer
3/14/25
Report Pass
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
Report Pass
4/3/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Establishes the temporary Agricultural Enforcement Pilot Program within the Department of Law Enforcement. Clarifies, creates, and strengthens laws regarding crimes and violations related to agriculture or agricultural lands. Establishes clear distinctions between administrative and criminal penalties. Establishes positions. Appropriates funds. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB125
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/17/25
Report Pass
2/10/25
Refer
2/10/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/14/25
Refer
3/14/25
Refer
3/14/25
Report Pass
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
Report Pass
4/3/25
Amends the definition of "eligible business activity" for State Enterprise Zone Program purposes to include retail sales of tangible personal property manufactured and sold in the enterprise zone to the final consumer, the processing of value-added agricultural products grown within an enterprise zone, the provision of professional services by health care professionals in health-care-related sectors, the use of advanced manufacturing to produce products, or the development of cybersecurity technology. Extends the eligibility period of the state business tax credit and general excise tax exemption for qualified businesses within state enterprise zones from 7 years to 9 years. Extends the eligibility period of the general excise tax exemption for qualified businesses within state enterprise zones engaged in the manufacturing of tangible personal property or the producing or processing of agricultural products from 10 years to 12 years. Makes the extension of the state business tax credit eligibility period applicable to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2025. Makes the extension of the general excise tax exemption eligibility period take effect on 1/1/2027. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1250
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/10/25
Refer
2/10/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
Establishes the Hawaii Farm to Families Program to alleviate food shortages in the State. Requires reports to the Legislature prior to the Regular Sessions of 2026 and 2027. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1251
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Establishes statewide, uniform standards to promote agricultural tourism activities in the State by establishing state agricultural tourism activity requirements that are applicable to all counties that have adopted an agricultural tourism ordinance. Requires agricultural tourism activities to be registered by the county planning commission. Requires agricultural tourism activities to coexist with an agricultural activity on a farming operation and requires termination of the agricultural tourism activities upon cessation of the agricultural activity. Makes conforming amendments.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1252
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/11/25
Refer
2/11/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
Report Pass
4/4/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Appropriates funds to the University of Hawaii to establish positions within the University of Hawaii at Manoa John A. Burns School of Medicine's Department of Geriatric Medicine to coordinate and incorporate training on Alzheimer's disease and other forms of dementia for health care providers into existing University of Hawaii programs; and review, update, and develop a dementia curriculum to be incorporated into existing University of Hawaii programs with the goal of establishing a local, informed dementia workforce. Requires annual reports to the Legislature. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1253
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Clarifies that the prohibition against board and commission holdover members from holding office beyond the end of the second regular legislative session following the expiration of the member's term of office takes precedence over any conflicting statutes.