All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1281

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/14/25  
Refer
2/14/25  
Report Pass
2/28/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Refer
3/6/25  
Report Pass
3/14/25  
Refer
3/14/25  
Report Pass
3/21/25  
Refer
3/21/25  
Report Pass
4/4/25  
Report Pass
4/24/25  
Extends the sunset date of Act 107, SLH 2023, which allows for the reimbursement of services provided through telehealth via an interactive telecommunications system, until 12/31/2027. (CD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1282

Introduced
1/23/25  
Establishes a schedule of late fees to be added to the original unpaid claim amount if a health insurer, mutual benefit society, or health maintenance organization fails to pay a provider within the required time.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1283

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/12/25  
Establishes the Emergency Home Loan Assistance Revolving Fund to be administered by the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation. Establishes terms for loans issued from the Revolving Fund. Requires annual reports to the Legislature. Appropriates funds.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1284

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/12/25  
Proposes a constitutional amendment to prohibit discrimination against a person because of ethnicity, age, disability, religion, national ancestry, sex, sexual orientation, gender identity, or pregnancy and pregnancy outcomes. (SD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1285

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/14/25  
Refer
2/14/25  
Report Pass
2/28/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Refer
3/6/25  
Report Pass
3/21/25  
Amends the administrative process at the Administrative Driver's License Revocation Office. Establishes a tiered administration revocation period of a driver's license for those arrested for operating a vehicle under the influence of an intoxicant. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1286

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/14/25  
Prohibits the collection, sale, or disclosure of any driver data that is obtained by a motor vehicle or other connected car service, feature, or application to any third-party without the explicit consent of the owner or lessee of the vehicle. Designates exemptions. Requires any disclosure notification for any data collection to be clear and conspicuous. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1287

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/12/25  
Refer
2/12/25  
Report Pass
2/28/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Requires under the State's wage compensation laws that food, beverage, and service establishments that accept tips and employ tipped employees post signs that include language explaining their tip allocation practices and the contact information for the Wage Standards Division of the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations and the Wage and Hours Division of the United States Department of Labor. Establishes back wages and penalties as available remedies for employees in the event of a violation. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1288

Introduced
1/23/25  
Establishes the Hawaii Efficient Transitional Homes Commission to provide recommendations for the efficient, effective, and transparent management of transitional homes. Requires annual reports to the Legislature.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1289

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/14/25  
Limits moving violations arising from the operation of a motor vehicle that appear on traffic abstracts to those that resulted in convictions. Requires the Traffic and Emergency Period Violations Bureaus to remove all dismissed moving violations not resulting in a conviction from certified abstracts. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB129

Introduced
1/15/25  
Refer
1/17/25  
Report Pass
2/12/25  
Refer
2/12/25  
Report Pass
2/27/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Prohibits the sale of raw ahi, including ahi poke or processed ahi, in retail establishments without a label that states the country where the ahi was landed. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1290

Introduced
1/23/25  
Requires, beginning 7/1/2027, any carcinogenic food or product sold or distributed in the State to include a warning label, in a format determined by the Department of Health. Defines "carcinogenic" as a food, product, or chemical classified as group 1 or group 2A by the World Health Organization's International Agency for Research on Cancer. Appropriates moneys.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1291

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/27/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Refer
3/6/25  
Report Pass
3/28/25  
Enrolled
3/31/25  
Chaptered
4/11/25  
Clarifies the education and professional experience requirements for certified public accountant license applicants to establish alternative pathways to licensure. (SD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1292

Introduced
1/23/25  
Establishes the Department of Environmental Protection. Renames the Department of Health as the Department of Community Health. Renames the Department of Human Services as the Department of Healthcare Services. Administratively attaches the Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund to the Department of Healthcare Services. Transfers certain responsibilities between departments.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1293

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/13/25  
Provides the amount of recovery for tenants who prevail in civil suits for a landlord's violation of the Residential Landlord-Tenant Code concerning a dwelling unit within an area that was a federally declared disaster area as of 8/8/2023. Provides for reasonable attorneys' fees and recovery for the cost of the suit. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1294

Introduced
1/23/25  
Requires all playgrounds located in state and county parks and on public school grounds to include special needs recreational playground equipment as part of the recreational apparatuses by 6/30/2027, including at a minimum a wheelchair accessible swing set. Establishes the Special Needs Recreational Playground Equipment Special Fund. Appropriates funds.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records