All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1295
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Establishes within the Department of Transportation the container licensing program to mitigate the influx of illegal contraband into the State. Imposes a nominal licensing fee of $1 per container. Subjects all containers entering the State to inspections and authorizes the seizure of contraband.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1296
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Refer
3/7/25
Report Pass
3/14/25
Refer
3/14/25
Report Pass
3/31/25
Report Pass
4/23/25
Report Pass
4/23/25
Enrolled
4/30/25
Exempts reconstruction of any lawfully constructed structure that was damaged or destroyed in a disaster proclaimed by the Governor to constitute a state of emergency or a disaster declared pursuant to federal law from the requirements of a special management area minor permit or a special management area use permit under certain conditions. Sunsets 7/1/2028. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1297
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Prohibits the Department of Health from issuing permits for commercial burning of green waste products in residential areas or within one thousand feet of a residential property.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1298
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
Report Pass
4/4/25
Report Pass
4/24/25
Report Pass
4/24/25
Expands the types of electronic devices subject to the Electronic Device Recycling and Recovery Act to include electronic device peripherals and certain legacy devices. Excludes manufacturers of only electronic device peripherals and no other electronic devices. Allows, rather than requires, the Department of Health to determine additional penalties. Requires manufacturers' recycling plans to describe communication efforts with the State and counties to facilitate consumer education efforts. Repeals the requirement that recycling plans be implemented and fully operational by 1/1/2023 in order for manufacturer collaboration authority to apply. Establishes additional manufacturer recycling goals beginning on 1/1/2026 and 1/1/2027. Requires additional information to be included in manufacturers' reports containing information for calendar years 2025, 2026, and 2027. Requires collectors to report certain information regarding recyclers and refurbishers and allows the Department of Health to require submission of bills of lading and recycler receiving reports. Requires a report to the Legislature. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1299
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Requires the Hawaii Technology Development Corporation to establish and implement projects to assist small businesses related to the tourism sector with technology enablement. Requires HTDC to submit a report to the Legislature. Appropriates funds.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB13
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/16/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
For taxable years beginning after 12/31/2025, establishes a 5-year aquaculture investment tax credit for taxpayers that incur qualifying investment costs relating to qualified aquaculture businesses. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB130
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/17/25
Report Pass
2/6/25
Refer
2/6/25
Requires government entities to seek reimbursement for all or a portion of search or rescue expenses for persons who require rescue after leaving a hiking trail to enter an area closed to the public or hiking on a trail closed to the public, and there is a sign giving notice of the closure.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB130
Requires government entities to seek reimbursement for all or a portion of search or rescue expenses for persons who require rescue after leaving a hiking trail to enter an area closed to the public or hiking on a trail closed to the public, and there is a sign giving notice of the closure.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1300
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/7/25
Refer
2/7/25
Report Pass
2/18/25
Engrossed
2/19/25
Refer
2/28/25
Report Pass
3/18/25
Refer
3/18/25
Report Pass
4/4/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Beginning with the 2025-2026 school year, expands free school meal coverage to students who currently qualify for reduced-price lunch. Beginning with the 2026-2027 school year, expands free school meal coverage to students whose family income is not more than three hundred per cent of the federal poverty level. Appropriates funds. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1301
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Establishes conditions under which archaeological inventory surveys and reconnaissance surveys are required. Establishes conditions under which archaeological permits may be issued and revoked and the practice of archaeology may be temporarily revoked. Modifies the composition and operations of island burial councils. Modifies procedures upon the inadvertent discovery of burial sites.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1302
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Requires owners or operators of waste combustion facilities to develop a plan to implement continuous monitoring and sampling technologies at each combustion unit to monitor and sample for certain air contaminants. Requires a publicly available website hosted by the Department of Health to track and display the data collected on the air contaminants. Requires the Department of Health to adjust permit limits for air contaminants based on the data collected. Requires annual reports to the Legislature.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1303
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/10/25
Refer
2/10/25
Updates the Agricultural Loan Program by lowering interest rates, increasing and standardizing loan limits, and reducing the number of credit denials. Authorizes the Program to issue lines of credit. Creates a new class of loans to encourage large scale agriculture of import replacement crops grown for the Farm to State Program. Appropriates funds into and out of the Agricultural Loan Revolving Fund. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1304
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/19/25
Refer
3/19/25
Report Pass
4/3/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Appropriates funds to the Department of Agriculture for the continued monitoring of pesticide drift in schools statewide. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1305
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Increases the ceiling of the pesticide use revolving fund. Effective July 1, 2025.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1306
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Establishes a Procurement Automation System Special Fund. Designates the Executive Director of the School Facilities Authority as the Chief Procurement Officer for the School Facilities Authority. Effective 1/1/2491. (SD1)