All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB132
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/17/25
Establishes the Hawaii start-up business loan program. Establishes the Hawaii start-up business loan program special fund. Requires DBEDT to submit an annual report to the Legislature regarding the program. Appropriates funds.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1320
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Establishes the Maui Wildfires Settlement Trust Fund to be administered by the Attorney General. Appropriates funds to fund the settlement of claims related to the 2023 Maui wildfires. Effective 4/23/2057. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1321
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Beginning July 1, 2025, extends the term of the Oversight Coordinator for the Hawaii Correctional System Oversight Commission. Clarifies that the Oversight Coordinator has the general authority to inspect agencies and correctional facilities without notice. (SD2)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1322
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Clarifies and expands the circumstances and procedures available for emergency transportation, examination, and hospitalization under chapter 334. Provides limits on liability for state and local governments and professionals during mental health emergency procedures while performing their duties in the course of employment. Expands the notice requirements for an emergency hospitalization to include an individual's health care surrogate and clarifies when notice to family members can be waived. Removes the authority of the family court to appoint a legal guardian in a proceeding for involuntary hospitalization. Removes the requirement that psychiatric facilities wait for a response on a notice of intent to discharge an involuntary hospitalization patient prior to discharge. Clarifies the circumstances under which a subject of an order for assisted community treatment can be administered medication over the subject's objection. Provides limits on liability for an assisted community treatment provider. Modifies the administrative authorization of medical treatment over the patient's objection to be reviewed by a single decision-maker who is a psychiatrist. Effective 12/31/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1323
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Adopts the Uniform Health-Care Decisions Act (2023) with amendments to replace chapters 327E and 327G, HRS. Effective 12/31/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1324
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Refer
2/4/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Amends multiple definitions and penalties for fireworks offenses, including heightened penalties if another person suffers substantial bodily injury, serious bodily injury, or death as a result of the fireworks offenses. Establishes criminal offenses of general fireworks or articles pyrotechnic prohibitions in the first and second degree; sending or receiving fireworks or articles pyrotechnic by air delivery; distributing fireworks or articles pyrotechnic to non-permit holder; removal or extraction of pyrotechnic contents; consumer fireworks prohibitions; refusal to provide identification; and violating requirements of carrier. Establishes an adjudication system and procedures to process fireworks infractions. Appropriates funds. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1325
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Defines the term "agricultural tourism" and includes it in the definition of "enterprise" to authorize the Agribusiness Development Corporation to financially support farming businesses engaged in agricultural tourism. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1326
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Authorizes the Hawaii Community Development Authority to cooperate with or assist public and private sector entities to engage in projects that improve the State. Establishes the transit-oriented development infrastructure improvement program. Repeals the transit-oriented development infrastructure improvement district and board, under chapter 206E, part X, HRS. Makes additional consistent revisions to chapter 206E.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1327
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to determine the effect of any proposed State affordable housing project within ninety days of a request for determination. Sets forth the historic review requirements based on the project area's known historic, cultural, and archaeological resources.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1328
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Makes the Dwelling Unit Revolving Fund Equity Pilot Program permanent. Allows partial or full repayment of Dwelling Unit Revolving Fund interim loans in the form of unit equity through the Dwelling Unit Revolving Fund Equity Program.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1329
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Creates a mixed-income rental housing subaccount under the Rental Housing Revolving Fund which shall make loans to mixed-income rental projects or units in a mixed-income rental project. Authorizes the transfer of moneys from the Rental Housing Revolving Fund to the Rental Housing Revolving Fund Mixed-Income Subaccount.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB133
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/17/25
Report Pass
2/6/25
Refer
2/6/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Refer
3/10/25
Authorizes state facilities to wheel electricity produced by their own facility from renewable energy sources to other state facilities pursuant to administrative rules or orders established by the Public Utilities Commission. Requires the Public Utilities Commission to submit a report to the Legislature. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1330
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Increases the cap for awards to assist businesses applying for the Small Business Innovation Research Grant Program and the Small Business Technology Transfer Grant Program of the Hawaii Technology Development Corporation. Adds purchasing of renewable energy systems as an eligible expense and clarifies that training on both new and existing manufacturing equipment is an eligible expense for the Manufacturing Development Grant Program. Clarifies that no tax credit is available for renewable energy systems purchased with a grant received under the Manufacturing Development Grant Program.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1331
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Requires the Office of Planning and Sustainable Development, in coordination with other agencies, to update the soil data used in the land study bureau soil rating system and create a mechanism for regular soil data updates. Appropriates funds. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1332
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Repeals the provision authorizing farm dwellings and farm employee housing on important agricultural lands, amends the provision for priority permit processing to include farm cluster housing, and adopts a new provision establishing farm cluster housing to incentivize the designation of lands as important agricultural lands pursuant to chapter 205, HRS.