All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1388

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/11/25  
Refer
2/11/25  
Report Pass
2/27/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Refer
3/6/25  
Report Pass
3/17/25  
Refer
3/17/25  
Adds the Superintendent of Education and Chairperson of the Board of Education to the School Facilities Authority Board as ex officio, nonvoting members. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD2)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1389

Introduced
1/23/25  
Expands the scopes of practice for occupational therapists, physical therapists, and speech pathologists to allow those professionals working for or contracted by the Department of Education to diagnose medical conditions that can be treated with their respective services.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB139

Introduced
1/15/25  
Authorizes any department of the Invasive Species Council, county, or any agent of a department of the Invasive Species Council or a county, including the Hawaii Ant Lab or an island-based invasive species committee to use community action programs for the control or eradication of certain invasive pests. Defines community action program. Exempts individuals participating in a community action program from pest control operator requirements and regulations.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1390

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/19/25  
Engrossed
2/27/25  
Changes the due date of the Department of Education's annual computer science legislative report from June 30 to October 31. (SD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1391

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/7/25  
Refer
2/7/25  
Report Pass
2/27/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Refer
3/6/25  
Report Pass
3/21/25  
Appropriates funds to the Department of Education for teacherrequested classroom supplies; provided that the private sector contributes matching funds. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1392

Introduced
1/23/25  
Requires the Department of Education to implement dyslexia-sensitive universal screenings, provide evidence-based interventions, and offer professional development on dyslexia and structured literacy.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1393

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/19/25  
Engrossed
2/27/25  
Refer
3/4/25  
Report Pass
3/14/25  
Refer
3/14/25  
Report Pass
3/21/25  
Refer
3/21/25  
Requires the School Facilities Authority to consult with the Department of Education and other impacted departments or agencies before the conveyance of ownership rights or lease of lands to the School Facilities Authority. Repeals the requirement that the Department of Education transfer title to lands it holds upon request of the School Facilities Authority. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD3)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1394

Introduced
1/23/25  
Amends the law to reduce the amount the Department of Education is required to charge for school meals to all students enrolled in department schools.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1395

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/11/25  
Refer
2/11/25  
Report Pass
2/28/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Refer
3/6/25  
Report Pass
3/14/25  
Allocates interest earned on balances within the emergency and budget reserve fund to the general fund in years in which the emergency and budget reserve fund's balance exceeds the State's fund balance objective. For any fiscal year following a fiscal year in which emergency and budget reserve fund interest is deposited into the general fund, requires the Governor to include in the budget or supplemental budget submitted to the Legislature a request that an amount of general funds equal to the amount of interest deposited be expended to advance projects that address climate change impacts. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1396

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/14/25  
Refer
2/14/25  
Report Pass
2/28/25  
Engrossed
3/6/25  
Refer
3/6/25  
Report Pass
3/14/25  
Refer
3/14/25  
Report Pass
3/21/25  
Refer
3/21/25  
Report Pass
4/4/25  
Refer
4/25/25  
Report Pass
4/25/25  
Beginning 7/1/2025, requires the Governor to request in the executive budget or supplemental budget that an amount of general funds that approximates the additional Transient Accommodations Tax revenue generated by this Act be expended to advance certain climate change mitigation and tourism projects. Increases the Transient Accommodations Tax rate beginning on 1/1/2026. Assesses the Transient Accommodations Tax on gross rental proceeds derived from cruise fares. Amends the amount of Transient Accommodation Tax that shall be deposited into the Mass Transit Special Fund. Amends the allowable uses of the Special Land and Development Fund and the portion of Transient Accommodations Tax collections that are allocated to the Special Land and Development Fund. Effective 1/1/2026. (CD2)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1397

Introduced
1/23/25  
Provides the Governor with discretion to not fill a vacant legislative position if the vacancy occurs one hundred twenty days or less from an upcoming primary election until after the results of the primary election are certified.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1398

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/14/25  
Directs the Office of Wellness and Resilience to collaborate with the Department of Human Services to, either directly or by contract, design, administer, and implement a program for trauma-informed organizational assessments and a training curriculum for the Child Welfare Services Branch of the Department of Human Services. Appropriates funds. Effective 12/31/2050. (SD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1399

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/14/25  
Establishes the Family Resilience Pilot Program within the Office of Wellness and Resilience and appropriates funds to execute the program, including the contracting of services. Appropriates funds. Effective 12/31/2050. Repeals 6/30/2030. (SD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB14

Introduced
1/15/25  
Beginning January 1, 2026, prohibits an insurer of property, homeowner's, or renter's insurance from increasing the premium for a policyholder's insurance policy upon renewal unless the insurer submits a report to the policyholder and Insurance Commissioner and receives approval from the Insurance Commissioner. Establishes penalties. Sunsets 1/1/2029.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB140

Introduced
1/15/25  
Refer
1/17/25  
Refer
1/28/25  
Report Pass
2/12/25  
Refer
2/12/25  
Report Pass
2/27/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Refer
3/6/25  
Report Pass
3/19/25  
Refer
3/19/25  
Report Pass
4/1/25  
Report Pass
4/24/25  
Prohibits the importation of firewood into the State unless the firewood is certified as heat-treated and labeled accordingly or the importation is authorized and permitted by the Department of Agriculture before importation. Requires persons who import firewood into the State to maintain, and make available on request, records of imports for at least two years. (CD1)

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records