All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1428
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Establishes a minimum age requirement for the sale of manufactured hemp products.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1429
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/14/25
Refer
3/14/25
Report Pass
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
Report Pass
4/4/25
Report Pass
4/24/25
Report Pass
4/24/25
Authorizes the Department of Health to impose penalties and take enforcement actions for violations of the medical cannabis laws. Increases the maximum number of qualifying patients a primary caregiver is authorized to care for from one to five patients. Retroactive to 1/1/2025, repeals the prohibition against primary caregivers cultivating medical cannabis for their qualifying patients, and authorizes primary caregivers to cultivate cannabis in an amount not to exceed an adequate supply for the qualifying patient; provided that each location used to cultivate cannabis shall be used to cultivate cannabis for not more than five qualifying patients. Extends for two years the sunset date for the interim rules adopted by the Department of Health and extends for four years the sunset date for the exemption from civil service of personnel hired by, or contracts entered into by, the Department of Health related to the medical cannabis dispensary system. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB143
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/17/25
Refer
1/27/25
Authorizes the issuance of special number plates to commemorate the island of Kahoolawe.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1430
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Requires manufactured hemp product distributors and manufactured hemp product retailers to register with the Department of Health to sell manufactured hemp products; requires the Department of Health to collect application fees and issue certificates of registration.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1431
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/11/25
Refer
2/11/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/18/25
Refer
3/18/25
Report Pass
4/4/25
Report Pass
4/24/25
Report Pass
4/24/25
Authorizes the Department of Health to establish a Hepatitis Prevention Program. Requires the Department of Health to develop and implement a statewide educational program to inform the public on how to identify and prevent hepatitis and aid in its early diagnosis. Requires the Department of Health to develop a statewide comprehensive hepatitis prevention plan. Repeals outdated provisions related to hepatitis. Appropriates funds and establishes positions for the Hepatitis Prevention Program. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1432
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/14/25
Refer
3/14/25
Establishes the Kalaupapa State Historical Area. Authorizes the Department of Health to continue providing services statewide to Hansen's disease patients living in the community. Repeals sections of Chapter 326, HRS, and makes associated conforming amendments, to take effect upon the oneyear anniversary of the passing of the last patient resident of Kalaupapa, as affirmed in a Governor's proclamation. Requires future planning for the Kalaupapa Settlement to include community organizations, including one selected in consultation with the Molokai community. Effective 12/31/2050. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1433
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/13/25
Refer
2/13/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/18/25
Refer
3/18/25
Report Pass
4/2/25
Report Pass
4/24/25
Report Pass
4/24/25
Amends the distribution system of sterile needles and syringes under the Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Program from a one-to-one exchange system to a needs-based distribution system. Authorizes non-injection drug user participation in the Program. Modifies liability for Program participants, staff, and law enforcement officers. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1434
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/13/25
Refer
2/13/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/18/25
Refer
3/18/25
Report Pass
4/3/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Establishes the Universal Immunization Funding Program as a universal funding model for immunization purchases by the Department of Health, to increase statewide access to immunizations for all persons under age sixty-five. Establishes the Universal Immunization Purchase Special Fund, into which fees collected from assessed entities and other sources of funding will be deposited, for purposes of bulk purchasing immunizations and administering the program. Appropriates funds. (CD2)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1435
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Beginning July 1, 2026, bans the sale of all flavored tobacco products and mislabeled e-liquid products. Establishes positions and appropriates funds to enforce the ban. Repeals section 328J-11.5, HRS. Effective July 1, 2025.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1436
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Repeals section 328J-11.5, HRS.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1437
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Repeals the non-medical exemption from immunization requirements.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1438
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
Report Pass
4/1/25
Enrolled
4/16/25
Prohibits home care agencies from providing services outside the scope of their facility license. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1439
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Clarifies that the Department of Health has the legal authority and obligation to prevent and address nuisances that affect environmental health or public health, or both. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB144
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/17/25
Report Pass
2/10/25
Refer
2/10/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Beginning 7/1/2027, allows chiropractic students enrolled in a qualified chiropractic college to engage in clinical practice as part of their college instruction if directly supervised by a qualified licensed chiropractor. Requires the Hawaii Board of Chiropractic to adopt rules. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1440
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Refer
2/7/25
Report Pass
2/13/25
Refer
2/13/25
Exempts certain positions in the Department of Health, including the Hawaii State Hospital, from civil service. Requires a report to the Legislature. (SD1)