All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1455

Introduced
1/23/25  
Clarifies the definition of "covered employer" under the Hawaii Retirement Savings Act. Requires covered employers to automatically enroll covered employees into the Hawaii Retirement Savings Program unless the covered employee chooses to opt out. Effective upon approval.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1456

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/12/25  
Refer
2/12/25  
Report Pass
2/28/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Refer
3/6/25  
Report Pass
3/14/25  
Refer
3/14/25  
Amends the definition of "beach restoration" to include activities undertaken to maintain and improve eroded beaches and degraded dune systems through the management of sand and native vegetation, place sand on an eroded beach, and remove abandoned remnant materials that pose a risk to public and ecosystem health. Appropriates funds for a Kahana Bay beach restoration pilot project and a sand restoration and dune replenishment pilot project on the island of Maui. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1457

Introduced
1/23/25  
Authorizes the Board of Land and Natural Resources to issue interim rules regarding commercial and recreational use of water sports equipment.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1458

Introduced
1/23/25  
Establishes within the Department of Land and Natural Resources the environmental stewardship fee program to collect a fee from visitors through an environmental stewardship license and allocate the revenue to protect, restore, and manage natural and cultural resources through grants to nonprofit organizations. Establishes the environmental stewardship fee special fund. Establishes the Environmental Stewardship Commission to make recommendations to the Board of Land and Natural Resources regarding the use of revenues in the special fund. Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to conduct rulemaking. Requires a report to the legislature, including an environmental stewardship fee strategic plan. Creates civil or administrative penalties to be imposed after July 1, 2030. Appropriates funds.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1459

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/14/25  
Appropriates funds to the Department of Land and Natural
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB146

Introduced
1/15/25  
Refer
1/17/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/14/25  
Refer
2/14/25  
Report Pass
2/28/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Refer
3/6/25  
Report Pass
3/21/25  
Refer
3/21/25  
Amends the conditions and procedures of alternative dispute resolution methods for condominium-related disputes, including the use of evaluative mediation or binding arbitration. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1460

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/12/25  
Requires that lease extensions approved by the Board of Land and Natural Resources be drafted on forms that reflect contemporary leasing practices and policies of the Board, and which shall control over conflicting or inconsistent provisions in the lease being extended.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1461

Introduced
1/23/25  
Adds a minimum penalty and amends the maximum penalty per violation of the State Water Code, expands the types of potential violations of the State Water Code, and makes each day that a violation exists or continues to exist a separate offense. Requires the Commission on Water Resource Management to consider certain factors when imposing penalties.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1462

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/12/25  
Refer
2/12/25  
Report Pass
2/28/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Refer
3/6/25  
Report Pass
3/19/25  
Reenacts the Historic Preservation Income Tax Credit. Establishes an annual cap amount on the tax credit of $1,000,000. Effective 7/1/3000. Sunsets 12/31/2030. (HD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1463

Introduced
1/23/25  
Amend sections 6E-3 and 76-16(b), HRS, to allow the Department of Land and Natural Resources to employ both civil service and non-civil service professional and technical staff in its State Historic Preservation Program.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1464

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/18/25  
Engrossed
2/19/25  
Refer
2/28/25  
Report Pass
4/4/25  
Report Pass
4/24/25  
Conforms Hawaii income and estate and generation-skipping transfer tax laws to the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended as of December 31, 2024. (CD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1465

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/14/25  
Engrossed
2/18/25  
Refer
2/28/25  
For taxable years beginning after 12/31/2024, requires all qualified members claiming a credit for pass-through entity taxation to adjust their income to include the qualified member's share of taxes paid by an electing pass-through entity. Effective July 1, 3000. (HD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1466

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/18/25  
Engrossed
2/19/25  
Refer
2/28/25  
Report Pass
4/4/25  
Enrolled
4/8/25  
Chaptered
4/24/25  
Clarifies that nonresidents who claim the refundable earned income tax credit are required to adjust the amount claimed using the ratio of their Hawaii adjusted gross income to federal adjusted gross income. Eliminates the unlimited carryforward on nonrefundable earned income tax credits for tax year 2022.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1467

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/18/25  
Engrossed
2/19/25  
Refer
2/28/25  
Report Pass
3/31/25  
Clarifies that a notice of appeal relating to an appeal of a county tax is not required to be served on the Director of Taxation. (HD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1468

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/13/25  
Repeals the general excise tax exemption for amounts received by independent sugar cane farmers. Repeals the general excise tax exemption for amounts received by a contractor of the Patient-Centered Community Care Program that is established by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs pursuant to title 38 United States Code section 8153. Effective 1/1/2026. (SD1)

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records