All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1482
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Amends section 286-236, HRS, to meet current federal regulations to allow the State to issue a limited-term non-domiciled commercial learner's permit and non-domiciled commercial driver's license for applicants who are unable to provide proof of citizenship or lawful permanent residency.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1483
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Restores the revenue bond authorization for the Department of Transportation to issue Highway Revenue Bonds for highway capital improvement projects authorized in Act 164, SLH 2023, as amended by Act 230, SLH 2024. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1484
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Authorizes the counties to sell or dispose of property bordering the ocean when the Department of Transportation requests the acquisition of the property for state highway purposes.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1485
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Appropriates funds out of the State Highway Fund for deposit into the Automated Speed Enforcement Systems Program Special Fund and apporitates funds out of the Automated Speed Enforcement Systems Program Special Fund for fiscal year 2025-2026.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1486
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Makes an emergency appropriation out of the State Highway Fund to provide funds for fiscal year 2024-2025 for the Department of Transportation to enforce the Motor Carrier Law.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1487
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
Authorizes the Board of Regents of the University of Hawaii to issue revenue bonds for the purpose of financing qualifying priority capital improvement projects. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1488
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/13/25
Refer
2/13/25
Establishes the University of Hawaii Conference Center Revolving Fund and accounts under the fund to facilitate the administration of the revolving fund for conference center programs among various campuses and operating units of the University of Hawaii system. Repeals the Conference Center Revolving Fund, University of Hawaii at Hilo, and the Community College Conference Center Revolving Fund. Transfers all appropriations and encumbrances of the Conference Center Revolving Fund, University of Hawaii at Hilo, and the Community College Conference Center Revolving Fund to the University of Hawaii Conference Center Revolving Fund. Effective 7/31/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1489
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Requires the University of Hawaii to grant the resident tuition fee for enrollment at any University of Hawaii campus to individuals who have graduated from a Hawaii high school and are enrolling in an undergraduate degree program, under certain conditions. Effective 7/31/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB149
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/17/25
Refer
2/7/25
Establishes that it is an unlawful discriminatory practice for public accommodations to deny a person with a disability full and equal enjoyment of information related to their services, facilities, privileges, advantages, or accommodations using information and communication technology intended for use by the general public as applicants, participants, customers, clients, or visitors.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1490
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/13/25
Refer
2/13/25
Amends the University of Hawaii Tuition and Fees Special Fund by allowing the Board of Regents to dedicate funding for student aid in direct response to an emergency or disaster, as declared by the Governor. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1491
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/13/25
Refer
3/13/25
Report Pass
4/3/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Adds the Department of Taxation and Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to the list of state agencies required to share data and determine the data to be shared through the Statewide Longitudinal Data System. Requires data shared by the Department of Taxation or Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism, to be aggregated or anonymized. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1492
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/11/25
Refer
2/11/25
Appropriates funds to the Department of Transportation to implement the recommendations of the Task Force on Mobility Management, established pursuant to Act 214, SLH 2013, in consultation with the Aging and Disability Resource Center of the Executive Office on Aging and other stakeholder groups.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1493
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/13/25
Refer
2/13/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Requires sellers or providers of emotional support animals, as well as those issuing verifications of a disability related need for an emotional support animal, to provide written notice to the buyer or recipient containing certain information. Requires persons or businesses that sell or provide certificates, vests, or identification tags that identify an animal as an emotional support animal to provide written notice to the buyer or recipient containing certain information. Establishes penalties. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1494
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/11/25
Refer
2/11/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Requires health insurance policies and contracts issued on or after 1/1/2026 to provide optional coverage for the cost of hearing aids at a minimum $1,500 per hearing aid for each hearing-impaired ear every thirty-six months. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1495
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/13/25
Refer
2/13/25
Exempts from the general excise tax, gross receipts received by a hospital, infirmary, medical clinic, health care facility, pharmacy, or a practitioner licensed to administer drugs to an individual, from the sale of hearing aids. Effective 12/31/2050. Sunsets 1/1/2027. (SD1)