All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1536

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/13/25  
Refer
2/13/25  
Report Pass
2/27/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Refer
3/6/25  
Report Pass
3/13/25  
Refer
3/13/25  
Report Pass
3/21/25  
Refer
3/21/25  
Report Pass
4/4/25  
Report Pass
4/25/25  
Repeals the exemption of the President and Chief Executive Officer of the Hawaii Tourism Authority from the State's Employees' Retirement System. Requires a retirant returning to service as the President and Chief Executive Officer of the Hawaii Tourism Authority to re-enroll into the Employees' Retirement System. (CD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1537

Introduced
1/23/25  
Prohibits the feeding of feral non-native animals on state land within one-half mile of the ocean or a stream. Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to enforce certain penalties for violations. Requires the counties to adopt or amend ordinances to prohibit the feeding of feral non-native animals on county land within one-half mile of the ocean or a stream and impose certain penalties for violations. Establishes an annual reporting requirement to the Legislature.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1538

Introduced
1/23/25  
Requires the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to identify all legislative districts in the State in which a majority of the population consists of Native Hawaiians. Designates these districts as Native Hawaiian majority districts.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1539

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/13/25  
Appropriates funds to offset the debt for the Waiahole Water System. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB154

Introduced
1/15/25  
Requires that all court records of any eviction proceeding be sealed within specified timeframes upon resolution of the proceeding. Authorizes the court to seal certain eviction records prior to the expiration of these timeframes upon motion by a tenant who is able to demonstrate that certain conditions apply. Requires the clerk of the court to provide access to sealed eviction records to the tenant. Makes it a discriminatory practice to require a person to disclose a sealed eviction record as a condition of certain real property transactions. Prohibits discrimination in real property transactions against a person with a sealed eviction record.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1540

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Beginning 1/1/2028, makes the most recent Hawaii state building codes adopted by the state building code council supersede all existing county building codes and thereafter allows counties to remove requirements of the state building codes or add requirements to the state building codes only with prior council approval. Repeals the counties' authority to adopt, amend, and update the Hawaii state building codes for their respective county building codes.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1541

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/12/25  
Refer
2/12/25  
Report Pass
2/28/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Refer
3/6/25  
Report Pass
3/14/25  
Refer
3/14/25  
Report Pass
3/21/25  
Appropriates funds for the Waiahole Water System for bond debt service and tunnel repair. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1542

Introduced
1/23/25  
Beginning 7/1/2027, requires app store providers to determine the age category for each of their users in the State and verify their age; provide a mechanism for parents to block minors from downloading unsuitable apps; and obtain parental consent before allowing a minor to use their app store or download and purchase apps. Requires certain app store providers to provide parents with a mechanism to set filters and usage limits for minors. Requires certain app store providers to display age ratings and content description for each app available in their app store. Establishes age verification and parental consent requirements for certain app developers. Establishes violations as unfair or deceptive act or practice. Requires the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs to adopt rules no later than 7/1/2026.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1543

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/12/25  
Refer
2/12/25  
Report Pass
2/27/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Requires each purchasing agency to provide justification for hiring external consultants. Caps the amount each agency can spend on external consultants. Requires each agency to seek approval from the Legislature for consulting contracts exceeding a certain dollar amount. Requires each agency to disclose new contracts with external consultants. Requires annual reports to the Legislature. Requires the Compliance Audit Unit to conduct regular audits of agency consultant contracts to assess cost-effectiveness and compliance. Requires each chief procurement officer to ensure that inherent government functions are not delegated to a contractor. Effective 1/1/2491. (SD2)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1544

Introduced
1/23/25  
Requires each public school to implement a policy to prohibit students from using cellular phones and other wireless communication devices during school hours, subject to exceptions for education, health, and emergencies.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1545

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/18/25  
Engrossed
2/19/25  
Refer
2/28/25  
Report Pass
3/21/25  
Repeals language in the State's Code of Ethics that exempts the legislative and judicial branches from prohibitions against nepotism in public employment. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1546

Introduced
1/23/25  
Requires retirants rehired as teachers or administrators in teacher shortage areas or in difficult-to-fill positions to be paid at least the minimum salary for their experience and qualifications. Prohibits rehired retirants from receiving additional employment benefits. Directs the Department of Education to adopt rules to identify teacher shortage areas and difficult-to-fill positions.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1547

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/13/25  
Refer
2/13/25  
Report Pass
2/27/25  
Engrossed
2/28/25  
Refer
3/4/25  
Report Pass
3/17/25  
Refer
3/17/25  
Authorizes the Department of Budget and Finance to issue special purpose revenue bonds to assist Aloun Kauai Farming LLC, in the planning, design, construction, and maintenance of an integrated dairy. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1548

Introduced
1/23/25  
Exempts Department of Education purchases of local edible produce and packaged food products less than a certain amount from the electronic procurement system requirement. Requires at least three written quotes for Department of Education purchases of local edible produce and packaged food products between certain amounts. Requires at least two written quotes for Department of Education purchases of local edible produce and packaged food products between certain amounts for certain schools in rural communities. Sunsets 6/30/2028.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1549

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/14/25  
Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds and appropriates funds to the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands for a capital improvement project for the construction of the Knehili community hale, a new access road, and a parking lot at the Knehili homestead.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records