All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1603

Introduced
1/23/25  
Appropriates funds for capital improvement projects in the 3rd senatorial district.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1604

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/13/25  
Appropriates funds to the University of Hawaii for the development of faculty, staff, teacher, and workforce housing at the Kauai Community College. Effective 7/31/2050. (SD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1605

Introduced
1/23/25  
Provides that investigative powers of the Department of Human Services under the Child Protective Act include interviews of adults living in the family home and the alleged perpetrator in the; Requires DHS to record and save adult interviews conducted as part of an investigation of a report of harm, threatened harm, or imminent harm to a child and to include recorded adult interviews in any filed petition for removal.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1606

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Imposes an increased penalty upon any person who trespasses upon certain state or county lands when the person trespasses again by returning, within 30 days after the initial offense, to the same land at which the person committed the initial offense.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1607

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
For the purposes of state justifiable-use-of-force law: (1) Amends the definition of "dwelling" to include agricultural land used as a residence or place of lodging; and (2) Creates a definition of "place of work" that includes agricultural land.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1608

Introduced
1/23/25  
Requires the Department of Education to assign school resource officers to department public schools and charter schools. Encourages the employment of qualified retirees from the local police departments and department of law enforcement. Appropriates funds for these positions.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1609

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/14/25  
Refer
2/14/25  
Report Pass
2/27/25  
Engrossed
2/28/25  
Refer
3/4/25  
Report Pass
3/13/25  
Requires the Department of Human Services to establish and implement an Early Learning Services Contracts Program to make available a designated number of seats at licensed infant and toddler child care centers and group child care centers that meet certain criteria. Requires the Department of Human Services to submit reports to the Legislature. Sunsets the pilot program on 6/30/2028. Effective 12/31/2050. (HD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB161

Introduced
1/15/25  
Refer
1/17/25  
Report Pass
2/11/25  
Allows state projects to be exempt from county building permit requirements under certain conditions. Requires all exempted state projects to be included in a report that is regularly made available to the public. Allows state agencies that undertake projects to be dedicated to a county to prepare programmatic or project-specific agreements that establish requirements and standards for review and acceptance if the agency wants the project to be exempted. Allows state agencies that want to be exempted from county permitting processes to establish a cooperative working group. Requires cooperative working groups to submit an interim report to the Legislature before the Regular Session of 2026. Effective 5/13/2040. (SD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1610

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/14/25  
Refer
2/14/25  
Report Pass
2/28/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Refer
3/6/25  
Report Pass
3/18/25  
Establishes the Ohana Zones Program as a program within the Statewide Office on Homelessness and Housing Solutions. Authorizes the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation to exempt ohana zones projects from general excise taxes. Requires annual reports to the Legislature. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1611

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/13/25  
Requires a person appointed to serve as the Governor's Senior Advisor for Mental Health and the Justice System, Governor's Coordinator on Homelessness, or another position that serves as a Senior Advisor to the Governor to obtain the advice and consent of the Senate. Effective 1/1/2491. (SD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1612

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/12/25  
Refer
2/12/25  
Report Pass
2/28/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Refer
3/6/25  
Report Pass
3/14/25  
Requires and appropriates funds for the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, in partnership with the Department of Health, to establish and implement a five-year Fitness to Proceed Pilot Program in one county of the State. Requires an interim report and final report to the Legislature. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1613

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/14/25  
Establishes the Hawaii Cannabis and Hemp Office within the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs to regulate all aspects of the cannabis plant. Beginning 1/1/2026, legalizes the personal adult use of cannabis. Establishes taxes on the retail sale of adult-use cannabis and the sale of medical cannabis. Adds new traffic offenses relating to the consumption or possession of marijuana or marijuana concentrate. Makes conforming amendments related to the legalization of personal adult use of cannabis. Beginning 1/1/2026, decriminalizes certain drug offenses related to marijuana and marijuana concentrate. Transfers the personnel and assets of the Department of Health and assets of the Department of Agriculture relating to cannabis to the Hawaii Cannabis and Hemp Office. Establishes various positions within state entities to regulate the personal adult use of cannabis. Appropriates funds. Effective 12/31/2050. (SD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1614

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/14/25  
Establishes what constitutes transit-oriented development and incentivizes development in county-designated transit-oriented development areas or zones. Prioritizes the allocation of a minimum percentage of the Rental Housing Revolving Fund for certain mixed-income rental housing projects or units. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1615

Introduced
1/23/25  
Requires the Department Education, in coordination with the Department of Health, to develop a fireworks education and marketing program for implementation in public schools, including charter schools, and distribution to private schools.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1616

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/13/25  
Requires the Department of Accounting and General Services to conduct a feasibility study on establishing dedicated child care centers in state buildings. Requires a report to the Legislature. Effective 1/1/2491. (SD1)

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records