All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB220

Introduced
1/15/25  
Authorizes a county that has adopted a surcharge to state tax to extend the surcharge to 12/31/2056. Extends the end date of the one percent Transient Accommodation Tax increase to 12/31/2056. Requires the State Auditor to conduct an audit and annual review of the Honolulu Authority for Rapid Transportation until 12/31/2056. Requires the Comptroller to certify the Honolulu Authority for Rapid Transportation's invoices for capital costs until 12/31/2056.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB221

Introduced
1/15/25  
Beginning with the 2025-2026 school year, requires the Department of Education to provide free breakfast and lunch to students enrolled in a public school who meet certain requirements. Appropriates funds.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB222

Introduced
1/15/25  
Refer
1/17/25  
Report Pass
2/7/25  
Refer
2/7/25  
Report Pass
2/19/25  
Engrossed
2/27/25  
Refer
3/4/25  
Report Pass
3/18/25  
Refer
3/18/25  
Report Pass
4/4/25  
Report Pass
4/24/25  
Report Pass
4/24/25  
Extends the sunset date of the Illegal Fireworks Task Force from 6/30/2025 to 6/30/2030 and extends the annual reporting requirements to the Legislature. (CD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB223

Introduced
1/15/25  
Refer
1/17/25  
Report Pass
2/12/25  
Refer
2/12/25  
Report Pass
2/28/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Refer
3/6/25  
Report Pass
3/21/25  
Refer
3/21/25  
Report Pass
4/3/25  
Report Pass
4/25/25  
Report Pass
4/25/25  
Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to establish an independent program relating to the prevention, control, and extinguishment of wildland fires within forest reserves. Authorizes the Administrator of Forestry and Wildlife to establish and maintain facilities for the performance of fire protection, fire prevention, pest control, and forest and range protection and enhancement activities. Allows the State Fire Council to amend the State Fire Code to require certain owners and occupants of properties and holders of easements located in hazardous fire areas to maintain effective firebreaks and to practice other fire prevention activities. Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to establish and implement the Community Fuels Reduction Project. Requires reports to the Legislature. Appropriates funds. (CD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB224

Introduced
1/15/25  
Refer
1/17/25  
Report Pass
2/5/25  
Refer
2/5/25  
Report Pass
2/28/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Refer
3/6/25  
Report Pass
3/13/25  
Refer
3/13/25  
Report Pass
3/21/25  
Refer
3/21/25  
Report Pass
4/3/25  
Requires the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation to assist inmates with obtaining civil identification cards and other identification documents within a certain time. (HD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB225

Introduced
1/15/25  
Requires defendants convicted of causing the death of a parent or legal guardian of a minor child by the operation of a vehicle in a negligent manner while under the influence of drugs or alcohol to make restitution in the form of financial support to each surviving child of the victim.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB226

Introduced
1/15/25  
Establishes requirements for the clinical review criteria and clinical practical guidelines used to establish step therapy protocols. Provides a process for a patient to request an exception to using step therapy protocols. Establishes insurance coverage requirements relating to the use of step therapy protocols and standards to appeal an adverse step therapy exception determination.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB227

Introduced
1/15/25  
Refer
1/17/25  
Report Pass
2/12/25  
Refer
2/12/25  
Report Pass
2/27/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Refer
3/6/25  
Report Pass
3/18/25  
Refer
3/18/25  
Establishes the Illegal Fireworks Enforcement Division within the Department of Law Enforcement. Appropriates funds. Sunsets 6/30/2028. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD2)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB228

Introduced
1/15/25  
Refer
1/17/25  
Report Pass
2/14/25  
Refer
2/14/25  
Report Pass
2/28/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Refer
3/6/25  
Report Pass
3/21/25  
Refer
3/21/25  
Prohibits excited delirium from being recognized as a valid medical diagnosis or cause of death in the State. Prohibits a medical examiner, coroner, or health care provider from stating on a certificate of death or in any report that the cause of death was excited delirium. Prohibits law enforcement officers from using the term excited delirium to describe an individual in an incident report. Establishes a new Hawaii Rule of Evidence that deems evidence that a person experienced or suffered an excited delirium inadmissible in a civil action. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD2)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB229

Introduced
1/15/25  
Requires the Department of Education to establish rules for the procurement of goods and services related to the administration of food programs at public schools that incorporate a geographic preference for unprocessed locally grown and locally raised food products.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB23

Introduced
1/15/25  
Removes discriminatory requirements for mandatory insurance coverage of in vitro fertilization procedures to create parity of coverage for same-sex couples, unmarried individuals, transgender persons, and opposite-sex couples for whom male infertility is the relevant factor. Requires the insured or the insured's dependent spouse to have a history of infertility of at least six months' duration, rather than five years. Includes need for medical intervention to conceive due to physiological or anatomical factors.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB230

Introduced
1/15/25  
Requires that if parking is to be included in any new state building construction, the design provide that at least twenty-five per cent of parking stalls be electric vehicle charger-ready. Requires the Hawaii State Energy Office, in consultation with the Department of Accounting and General Services and the Department of Transportation, to conduct a survey and identify certain high-priority state facilities. Establishes a goal of the State to retrofit state facilities to be electric vehicle charger-ready. Requires a report to the Legislature. Appropriates funds.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB231

Introduced
1/15/25  
Requires the counties to adopt ordinances setting forth procedures and requirements for the review and permitting of agricultural tourism uses and activities as secondary uses, in addition to accessory uses, on a working farm or farming operation. Requires the counties' ordinances to include requirements that: the principal agricultural use on a working farm or farming operation preexists the issuance of any land use permit or building permit for any accessory and secondary use; agricultural tourism includes only those activities that are allowed under existing zoning and land use regulations; and agricultural tourism be allowed only on land on which productive agricultural use is occurring.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB232

Introduced
1/15/25  
Requires government entities in the State that issue building permits to implement SolarAPP+ or a functionally equivalent online automated permitting platform that verifies code compliance and issues permits to licensed contractors for solar distributed energy resource systems in real-time by 1/1/2026. Requires government entities in the State that issue building permits in areas served by an investor-owned electric utility to adopt a self-certification process for solar distributed energy resource systems that are not SolarAPP+ compatible.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB233

Introduced
1/15/25  
Refer
1/17/25  
Report Pass
2/14/25  
Requires the Hawaii Clean Energy Initiative Program to design and implement a plan to increase jobs that strengthen emergency preparedness and climate resilience. Authorizes the use of the Energy Security Special Fund to advance the State's goals of strengthening emergency preparedness and climate mitigation.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records