All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB232

Introduced
1/15/25  
Requires government entities in the State that issue building permits to implement SolarAPP+ or a functionally equivalent online automated permitting platform that verifies code compliance and issues permits to licensed contractors for solar distributed energy resource systems in real-time by 1/1/2026. Requires government entities in the State that issue building permits in areas served by an investor-owned electric utility to adopt a self-certification process for solar distributed energy resource systems that are not SolarAPP+ compatible.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB233

Introduced
1/15/25  
Refer
1/17/25  
Report Pass
2/14/25  
Requires the Hawaii Clean Energy Initiative Program to design and implement a plan to increase jobs that strengthen emergency preparedness and climate resilience. Authorizes the use of the Energy Security Special Fund to advance the State's goals of strengthening emergency preparedness and climate mitigation.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB234

Introduced
1/15/25  
Establishes a Plant-Based Building Materials Working Group to study how best to grow plants, develop plant-based building materials in Hawaii, and provide economic development and green jobs while sequestering greenhouse gases to help achieve the State's climate target. Requires a report to the legislature.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB235

Introduced
1/15/25  
Requires the Department of Education to authorize and facilitate complex areas or individual department schools to form their own farm to school meal programs through partnerships to meet the local farm to school meal goal of thirty per cent of food served in the school to consist of locally sourced products by 2030. Allows the Department of Education to establish a plant-based meal program no later than the 2026-2027 school year.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB236

Introduced
1/15/25  
Part II: Requires certain priority level 1 cesspools to be upgraded, converted, or connected before 1/1/2035, and priority level 2 cesspools to be upgraded, converted, or connected before 1/1/2040, rather than before 1/1/2050. Part III: Appropriates funds to the Department of Health to implement the Cesspool Compliance Pilot Grant Project established pursuant to Act 153, Session Laws of Hawaii 2022. Part IV: Establishes an income tax credit for the cost of upgrading or converting a qualified cesspool to a Director of Health-approved wastewater system or connecting to a sewerage system, and requires the Auditor to periodically review the tax credit.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB237

Introduced
1/15/25  
Expands the authority of the State and counties to develop adaptation pathways plans to modify and relocate infrastructure away from critically threatened areas to locations outside sea level rise and coastal flooding exposure areas. Appropriates funds.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB238

Introduced
1/15/25  
Establishes and appropriates funds for a three-year New Wastewater System and Individual Wastewater System Technology Demonstration and Implementation Pilot Program within the University of Hawaii at Manoa Water Resources Research Center. Requires the University of Hawaii at Manoa Water Resource Research Center to submit reports to the Legislature. Appropriates funds.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB239

Introduced
1/15/25  
Refer
1/17/25  
Report Pass
2/11/25  
Requires certain state buildings, including public school buildings, for which construction is anticipated to commence on or after 7/1/2026 to be designed to withstand category five hurricanes and be used as shelters in the event of an emergency. (SD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB24

Introduced
1/15/25  
Refer
1/16/25  
Report Pass
2/7/25  
Establishes an organizational, tax, and regulatory framework for limited-profit housing associations. Establishes the Limited-Profit Housing Council to oversee limited-profit housing associations. (SD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB240

Introduced
1/15/25  
Amends the definition of "farming operation" by including customary and traditional subsistence farming conducted by native Hawaiian cultural practitioners and excluding concentrated animal feeding operations and business entities with unclear or non-transparent ownership or beneficiary structures. Establishes additional criteria for farming operations to meet in order to be protected against nuisance claims. Clarifies the purpose and intent of the Hawaii Right to Farm Act.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB241

Introduced
1/15/25  
Establishes the Climate Health and Environmental Action Special Fund in the Department of Land and Natural Resources to minimize the impacts of, and respond to, climate crises, which, beginning 1/1/2026, will be funded by a $25 tax on transient accommodations. Exempts certain housing used for emergencies during a state disaster from the Transient Accommodations Tax. Appropriates funds.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB242

Introduced
1/15/25  
Refer
1/17/25  
Report Pass
2/14/25  
Refer
2/14/25  
Report Pass
2/28/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Prohibits foreign entities from owning, leasing, or holding a controlling interest in more than an unspecified number of acres of agricultural land. Limits the lease term for agricultural land by foreign entities. Requires foreign entities that own or lease interest in agricultural lands to file an annual report with the Department of Agriculture. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB243

Introduced
1/15/25  
Refer
1/17/25  
Extends the State's energy-efficiency portfolio standards from 2030 to 2045. Authorizes the Public Utilities Commission to establish interim goals and clarifies procedures.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB244

Introduced
1/15/25  
Amends conservation and resources law to prohibit: (1) Commercial sales of parrotfish that have been caught by spearing; and (2) The spearing of parrotfish in state waters after sunset or before sunrise.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB245

Introduced
1/15/25  
Beginning 1/1/2026, prohibits certain entities from owning, purchasing, or acquiring ownership of agricultural lands.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records