All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB30
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/16/25
Report Pass
2/10/25
Refer
2/10/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/18/25
Refer
3/18/25
Report Pass
4/2/25
Report Pass
4/24/25
Report Pass
4/24/25
Enrolled
5/1/25
Prohibits persons under the age of sixteen from driving a moped. Requires all persons driving a moped to wear a safety helmet, regardless of age. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB300
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/21/25
Establishes unspecified deadlines for the governor to appoint, and for political parties to nominate, individuals to fill certain state senatorial vacancies. Provides that if the Governor fails to appoint an individual to fill a state legislative vacancy by an applicable statutory deadline, the President of the Senate or the Speaker of the House of Representatives shall make the appointment within an unspecified number of calendar days after the deadline.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB301
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/21/25
Refer
1/28/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/19/25
Refer
3/19/25
Establishes an additional penalty for a dog owner whose dog destroys property while on land zoned for agricultural use. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB302
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Amends the definition of "cultural". Prohibits the use of consumer fireworks except for cultural use by permit. Repeals the wording of section 132D-3(1), HRS, that generally allows the use of consumer fireworks without a permit on New Year's Eve, New Year's Day, and the Fourth of July. Makes it unlawful to offer, display for sale, sell, or furnish consumer fireworks to any person except for cultural use by permit, with a cap of not more than five permits per person. Prohibits the sale of fireworks to a person more than 5 calendar days before a permitted cultural use. Imposes a fee of $25 per permit for the purchase and cultural use of consumer fireworks. Imposes a statewide limitation on consumer fireworks, except by permit for cultural use. Effective 7/1/2025. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB303
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/21/25
Amends the sunset date of Act 83, Session Laws of Hawaii 2012, to repeal section 46-19.8, Hawaii Revised Statutes, on June 29, 2025.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB304
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/10/25
Refer
2/10/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
Report Pass
4/4/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Enrolled
5/1/25
Establishes positions and appropriates funds for the Adult Client Services Branch of the First Circuit Court. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB305
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/21/25
Establishes fees that medical providers may charge for requests for a patient's medical records from the patient's family member, caregiver, or representative. Requires medical providers to respond to requests in a timely manner. Establishes penalties.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB306
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/21/25
Prohibits a landlord from recovering possession of a dwelling unit from a tenant if the habitability of the premises is significantly impaired. Caps a tenant's liability for rent if the habitability of the premises is significantly impaired. Provides remedies for retaliatory evictions.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB307
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/5/25
Refer
2/5/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/14/25
Refer
3/14/25
Report Pass
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
Establishes the right of a person to record law enforcement activities. Establishes a private right of action for any violation of the right to record law enforcement activities. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD2)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB308
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Expands the ban on pistols with a detachable magazine with over a ten-round capacity to any firearm with a detachable magazine with over a thirty-round capacity. Exempts detachable ammunition magazines with a capacity in excess of thirty rounds that are designed for or capable of use with any firearm other than a pistol obtained before 1/1/2026. Effective 1/1/2026. (SD2)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB309
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/21/25
Requires periodic inspections of certain walls and appurtenances of buildings five or more stories in height. Establishes procedures for inspections, preparing inspection reports, and responding to report findings.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB31
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/16/25
Report Pass
2/10/25
Refer
2/10/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/18/25
Refer
3/18/25
Report Pass
4/2/25
Report Pass
4/24/25
Report Pass
4/24/25
Enrolled
5/1/25
Authorizes a person who discovers a recorded discriminatory restrictive covenant to take certain actions, without liability, to invalidate the covenant. Defines discriminatory restrictive covenant. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB310
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/21/25
Authorizes a county with a pre-existing surcharge to continue the surcharge after December 31, 2030, at a lower rate of one-fourth per cent. Authorizes counties that have not adopted a surcharge ordinance on state tax to adopt a surcharge ordinance at the current rate of one-half of one per cent through December 31, 2030, and at a rate of one-fourth of one per cent after December 31, 2030. Expands the authorized use of surcharge revenues to more than capital costs of a locally preferred alternative for a mass transit project for counties with a population greater than five hundred thousand.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB311
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/21/25
Refer
1/29/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Enrolled
3/10/25
Report Pass
3/18/25
Refer
3/18/25
Proposes an amendment to the Hawaii State Constitution to provide that freedom of speech protected under the Hawaii State Constitution does not include the expenditure of money to influence elections. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB312
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/11/25
Refer
2/11/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/18/25
Refer
3/18/25
Prohibits a state- or county-owned vehicle purchased on or after 1/1/2028, from using an audible reverse warning system that emits a warning sound other than one using broadband technology. Authorizes the Director of Transportation to grant exemptions under certain circumstances. Requires the Director of Transportation to maintain an updated record of all exemptions granted and a report to the Legislature. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)