All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB421
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Requires the Department of Education to administer a general dyslexia screening to all students in kindergarten through grade three. Requires the Department of Education to continue to administer the general English language arts universal screening for students in kindergarten through grade nine. Requires the Department of Education to collaborate with teacher training programs to ensure prospective candidates are trained on literacy instruction, including evidence-based intervention, to support all students. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB422
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/13/25
Refer
3/13/25
Report Pass
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
Authorizes the Department of Education to award a high school diploma to qualified persons who did not receive a high school diploma as a result of compulsory or voluntary induction into the armed services of the United States or whose high school education was interrupted due to wartime practices during World War II, the Korean War, or the Vietnam War. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB423
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/19/25
Engrossed
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
Report Pass
3/13/25
Refer
3/13/25
Report Pass
3/31/25
Report Pass
4/24/25
Report Pass
4/24/25
Enrolled
5/1/25
Requires one voting member of the Early Learning Board to have experience as a local provider of early childhood education and development services. Adds the Director of the Hawaii Head Start State Collaboration Office as an ex officio, nonvoting member to the Early Learning Board. Requires the Early Learning Board to invite the President of the Head Start Association of Hawaii, or their designee, to serve as an ex officio, nonvoting member of the Board. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB424
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Establish certain minimum registered nurse-to-patient ratios for hospitals. Establishes a process to obtain a variance from the minimum registered nurse staffing standards. Requires hospitals to establish hospital registered nurse staffing committees by 9/1/2025 to develop and adopt registered nurse staffing plans. Requires the staffing committees to submit a charter to the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations. Beginning 7/1/2026, requires hospitals to submit their registered nurse staffing plan on an annual basis, and implement the staffing plan. Establishes a complaint and appeals process and penalties. Appropriates funds.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB425
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Clarifies that the civil service exemption for personal service contracts for building, custodial, and grounds maintenance services with qualified community rehabilitation programs shall not cost more than $850,000 in the aggregate per private person or entity, regardless of the number of contracts or qualified community rehabilitation programs utilized for the personal service. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB426
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Establishes an Early Learning Apprenticeship Grant Program to be administered by the University of Hawaii to provide financial support for early learning program service providers in the State to participate in state- or federally-approved early learning apprenticeship programs. Requires an annual report to the Legislature. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/31/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB427
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Prohibits the State from leasing any public lands, or extending the lease of any public lands, to any individual, corporation, or federal agency that is in arrears in the payment of certain moneys to the State, noncompliant with a consent decree or memoranda of agreement with the State that requires environmental maintenance or remediation with regard to the subject public lands, or convicted of a crime. Requires certification by the Office of the Governor before the issuance or extension of any federal lease that the individual, corporation, or federal agency is in good standing with the State. Provides that, if any existing lessee of public lands is found not to be in good standing with the State as of the effective date of this Act, the lessee shall have three years, or until the end of the lease term, whichever is sooner, to correct the violation or the lease shall be terminated.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB428
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/4/25
Refer
2/4/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/18/25
Refer
3/18/25
Report Pass
4/4/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Enrolled
5/1/25
Increases the fees paid to witnesses in civil and criminal trials. Changes the fees paid to witnesses in civil trials for travel expenses from 20 cents a mile to the mileage allowance prescribed by the Administrator of General Services. Authorizes reimbursement to witnesses in civil trials for use of common carriers. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB429
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Creates an incremental prohibition on tobacco products and electronic smoking devices by restricting their sale, possession, furnishing, or consumption in a public place to people born after 1/1/2005. Effective 1/1/2026.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB43
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/16/25
Beginning with the 2025-2026 school year, requires the Department of Education to provide free breakfast and lunch to all students enrolled in department schools. Appropriates funds.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB430
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/18/25
Engrossed
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
Requires the Department of Taxation to provide refunds to taxpayers at the same interest rate as the federal government. Effective 7/1/2025. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB431
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Allows persons entitled to park in disabled parking spaces to report vehicles illegally parked in disabled parking spaces to the Department of Law Enforcement. Upon receipt of a legitimate report, requires the Department to send a notice to the offender informing them of the report and advising them of the law and penalties for illegally parking in a handicapped space.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB432
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Requires publicly held domestic corporations to have gender-diverse boards of directors. Requires the Director of Commerce and Consumer Affairs to publish certain reports on the Department's website. Establishes penalties.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB433
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Prohibits any person from openly carrying a deadly or dangerous weapon. Includes bladed weapon in the list of deadly or dangerous weapons. Establishes an affirmative defense to a prosecution for the purposes of lawful self-defense and transporting a weapon.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB434
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Establishes a pilot program in the Department of Health to provide intensive mobile treatment-type services, e.g., "street psychiatry", to chronically houseless adult individuals suffering from serious brain disorders like schizophrenia and schizoaffective disorder. Requires reports to the Legislature. Appropriates funds.