All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB435
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/10/25
Refer
2/10/25
Requires the Office of Elections to include a notice to voters that a digital and print voter information guide is available. Requires the notice to be in thirty-two-point font and enclosed as a separate insert with each ballot. Requires the Office of Elections to maintain a notice on its website providing certain information about the voter information guide. Requires the Office of Elections to make the digital voter information guide available to the public no later than twenty-one days before the primary election and no later than fifty days before the general election. Appropriates funds. Effective 4/23/2057. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB436
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Engrossed
2/28/25
Refer
3/4/25
Provides that no person shall serve as State Fire Marshal for more than three terms. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB437
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Exempts the Center for Cultural and Technical Exchange Between East and West, Inc. from the qualifying standards and conditions related to the receipt of funds contained in chapter 42F, Hawaii Revised Statutes, provided that if the center contracts with a recipient or provider, then the conditions in chapter 42F, shall apply to that recipient or provider and the contract.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB438
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/14/25
Refer
3/14/25
Report Pass
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
Report Pass
4/4/25
Prohibits landfill units on land in an agricultural district with class A soils. Beginning 7/1/2025, narrows the prohibition on constructing, modifying, or expanding waste or disposal facilities within a one-half mile buffer zone of residential, school, or hospital property lines to apply specifically to landfill units or components of landfill units. Beginning 7/1/2025, prohibits the construction, modification, or expansion of a landfill unit, or any component of a landfill unit, inland of an underground injection control line in a county with a population greater than five hundred thousand, with certain exemptions. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD3)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB439
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Refer
2/12/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
Report Pass
4/4/25
Requires the Board of Land and Natural Resources to adopt rules to impose user fees that apply solely to nonresidents visiting state parks and trails, as selected by the Board. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB44
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/16/25
Authorizes the counties to prohibit discrimination against a renter based on the renter's source of income.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB440
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/7/25
Refer
2/7/25
Report Pass
2/18/25
Engrossed
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
Report Pass
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
Report Pass
4/3/25
Establishes the Future Career and Technical Education Teacher Scholarship Program to be administered by the Department of Education to facilitate the recruitment and retention of career and technical education teachers in Hawaii public schools. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB441
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/18/25
Refer
3/18/25
Report Pass
4/3/25
Designates the Hawaii Symphony Orchestra as the State of Hawaii Symphony Orchestra. Exempts general fund appropriations to the State of Hawaii Symphony Orchestra from the requirements of chapter 42F, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Requires annual reports to the Legislature. Appropriates funds for general operating costs of the Orchestra and for deposit into the State of Hawaii Endowment Fund. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB442
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Refer
2/12/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/20/25
Refer
3/20/25
Allows a retirant to be employed without reenrollment in the Employees' Retirement System and without loss or interruption of benefits if the retirant is employed in a position identified for succession planning purposes. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB443
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Engrossed
2/28/25
Refer
3/4/25
Report Pass
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
Report Pass
4/4/25
Requires that lands within the agricultural district with class B or C soils that have solar or wind energy facilities must also obtain certification from the Department of Agriculture that the lands are also used for a farming operation. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD2)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB444
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Authorizes boards and commissions to make employment decisions related to its officers and employees without the approval of the head of the department to which the board or commission is administratively attached.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB445
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Requires and appropriates moneys for the Public Utilities Commission to establish standards requiring each electric utility company to remove from the rate base a commensurate amount of costs related to fossil fuel resources when adding new or converted renewable electrical energy and renewable energy resources.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB446
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Refer
1/28/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Beginning 7/1/2025, prohibits the construction, modification, or expansion of a landfill unit or any component of a landfill unit mauka of the underground injection control line without first establishing a buffer zone of not less than one-quarter mile around the landfill unit. Prohibits the utilization of fly ash, bottom ash, or a combination of fly and bottom ash from a municipal waste combustor, including any ash residue that remains after removal of metals for recycling into new metal products, for the purposes of road building, construction, or as alternative daily cover material on a landfill. Effective 12/31/2050. (SD2)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB447
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Engrossed
2/28/25
Refer
3/4/25
Report Pass
3/14/25
Refer
3/14/25
Report Pass
3/20/25
Refer
3/20/25
Report Pass
4/3/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Enrolled
5/1/25
Establishes a Hiring Pilot Program within the Department of Health, which includes an amended hiring procedure for delegated position classifications, certain flexibilities regarding minimum qualifications for positions having a salary range at or below SR-10, the ability to directly hire certain individuals into a civil service position if certain conditions are met, and the authority to make certain temporary appointments at the merited civil service pay scale without step limitation. Applies to recruitments initiated before 7/1/2028. Requires annual reports to the Legislature. Sunsets 7/1/2028. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB448
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/11/25
Refer
2/11/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Engrossed
2/28/25
Refer
3/4/25
Report Pass
3/11/25
Refer
3/11/25
Appropriates funds to the Agribusiness Development Corporation to acquire a conservation easement on agricultural lands in Central Oahu. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)