All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB462
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/10/25
Refer
2/10/25
Requires all performance incentive contracts to specify a pricing basis, performance goals, and a formula in calculating the contractor's profit, fees, or price decrease if the specified performance goals are exceeded or not met. Effective 1/1/2525. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB463
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Beginning 1/1/2026, requires kratom products to be registered with the Department of Health and imposes labeling requirements.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB464
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Allows direct shipment of beer and distilled spirits by certain licensees. Requires the liquor commission of each county to adopt rules and regulations.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB465
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
Report Pass
4/3/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Enrolled
5/1/25
Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to conduct a study of the carrying capacity of Kikiaola Small Boat Harbor and its surrounding area in the County of Kauai. Requires a report to the Legislature. Appropriates funds. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB466
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Requires the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation (HHFDC) to consider as a preference under chapter 201H, HRS, the proximity between the housing location and the applicant's place of employment; whether the applicant is a state or county employee; and whether the applicant is a returning resident that left the State to attend a university, college, or trade school and has graduated within the past two years. Requires, for any project developed or administered by the HHFDC under chapter 201, HRS, the HHFDC to set aside as a matter of preference an undetermined per cent of available units for state or county employees, when feasible. Requires HHFDC to determine the order of preferences and rank applicants accordingly, select applicants based on application date within the pool of similarly ranked applicants, and validate the preference status of applicants before occupancy of a unit. Authorizes HHFDC to adopt rules to establish additional eligibility criteria.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB467
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Authorizes each county that has established a surcharge on state tax before 7/1/2015 to extend the surcharge until 12/31/2045, at the same rates, if the county does so before 1/1/2028; Provides that no county surcharge on state tax authorized for a county that has not established a surcharge on state tax before 7/1/2015, shall be levied before 1/1/2019, or after 12/31/2045; and Repeals certain conditions on the use of surcharges received from the State for counties having a population equal to or less than 500,000 that adopt a county surcharge on state tax.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB468
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Refer
1/27/25
Repeals existing statutory language that: (1) declares that the sale of cigarettes, tobacco products, and electronic devices are a statewide concern; and (2) preempts all local ordinances and regulations that regulate the sale of cigarettes, tobacco products, and electronic devices.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB469
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Establishes the Homeless Services Special Fund. Allows counties to apply for matching funds from the Affordable Homeownership Revolving Fund for certain housing projects. Increases the conveyance tax rates for certain properties. Establishes conveyance tax rates for multifamily residential properties. Establishes new exemptions to the conveyance tax. Allocates collected conveyance taxes to the Affordable Homeownership Revolving Fund, Homeless Services Special Fund and, and Dwelling Unit Revolving Fund. Amends allocations to the Land Conservation Fund and Rental Housing Revolving Fund.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB47
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/16/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Designates the day of the second new moon after the winter solstice of each year as the Lunar New Year. Establishes the Lunar New Year as a state holiday. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB470
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Establishes a deferred retirement option program to allow qualified officers who are eligible for retirement to continue working.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB471
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Requires newly installed or modified individual wastewater systems that are near the shoreline, or likely to pollute groundwater, to include denitrification capacity.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB472
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Accelerates the dates for the required upgrades, conversions, or connections of priority level 1 and priority level 2 cesspools to 2035 and 2040, respectively. Appropriates funds to implement the cesspool compliance pilot grant program. Re-establishes a cesspool upgrade, conversion, or connection tax credit.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB473
Introduced
1/16/25
Refer
1/21/25
Appropriates funds for the operating and capital improvement budget of the Executive Branch for fiscal years 2025-2026 and 2026-2027.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB474
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/7/25
Refer
2/7/25
Requires clinical psychologists employed by the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation to obtain licensure within five years from the date of employment. Sunsets on 7/1/2030. Effective 7/1/2077. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB475
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/21/25
Requires and appropriates moneys for the Department of Human Services to develop and implement a public assistance program offering state-funded colorectal screenings for certain persons. Requires coverage for all colorectal cancer screenings in the State to be consistent with the Affordable Care Act Implementation Frequently Asked Questions published by the United States Department of Labor, United States Department of Health and Human Services, and United States Department of the Treasury.