All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB53
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/16/25
Expands eligibility for the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program to include any individual or household whose monthly income is equal to or less than three hundred per cent of the federal poverty level. Appropriates funds.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB530
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Establishes Braille literacy as a policy of the State. Requires literacy assessments for eligible low vision and blind students to include Braille instruction and the use of Braille. Authorizes the Department of Education to adopt administrative rules. Establishes the Braille Literacy Resource Center. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB531
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/21/25
Establishes provisions for the storage and maintenance of a stock supply of bronchodilators at schools. Requires the Department of Education to establish a protocol for the storage, usage, and administration of bronchodilators. Establishes provisions regarding the administration of certain medications by a volunteer at Department of Education schools. Clarifies labeling requirements for bronchodilator prescriptions issued to the Department of Education for a stock supply of bronchodilators.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB532
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/13/25
Refer
3/13/25
Report Pass
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
Report Pass
4/4/25
Report Pass
4/24/25
Report Pass
4/24/25
Enrolled
5/1/25
Authorizes school staff and agents trained by a health care professional to volunteer to administer medication to students at Department of Education public schools under certain conditions. Clarifies who may prescribe medication to be administered to students in schools. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB533
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/7/25
Refer
2/7/25
Report Pass
2/18/25
Engrossed
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
Report Pass
3/13/25
Refer
3/13/25
Refer
3/14/25
Appropriates funds to the Department of Education to support public schools impacted by a local investorowned electric utility's planned public safety power shutoff program. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB534
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Clarifies the process by which the Hawaii Community Development Authority may approve residential development on certain parcels of Kakaako Makai. Raises the building height limit and the maximum floor area ratio on certain parcels in the area. Requires a certain percentage of the residential units developed on certain parcels to be allocated to households at or below a certain income level in perpetuity, with priority given to certain essential workforce in the area. Limits the sale of residential units developed in certain residential developments to prospective owner-occupants. Requires the Office of Hawaiian Affairs to determine a Kakaako Makai association fee to be collected from residents, tenants, and lessees of certain parcels to be deposited into a special account in the Office of Hawaiian Affairs Special Fund to fund various services and projects in the Kakaako Makai area. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB535
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/21/25
Establishes an Advisory Committee convened by the Department of Land and Natural Resources and the Department of Health to inventory lands owned by the United States government which may be reasonably transferred back to the State and to make recommendations on relevant land conditions and appropriateness of potential transfer. Requires reports to the Legislature.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB536
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/21/25
Requires the Department of Health to construct, establish, and operate an environmental toxins testing laboratory to test samples submitted by the public for diseases; water, air, and soil quality; and complex testing. Requires a report to the Legislature. Authorizes the Director of Finance to issue general obligation bonds. Appropriates funds.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB537
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/21/25
Establishes statewide goals for solid waste reduction and organic waste diversion. Requires each county to incorporate into its next integrated solid waste management plan revision a plan to reduce all organic waste produced within the county by facilities generating more than a specified amount of organic waste per year in alignment with established state benchmarks. Appropriates funds.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB538
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/21/25
Requires municipal solid waste combustor ash to be disposed of only in a lined landfill. Prohibits the reuse of municipal solid waste incinerator ash for uses such as roadbuilding, fill, or construction.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB539
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/21/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Requires state agencies that monitor environmental toxins and pollutants to establish environmental action levels (EALs) to ensure the preservation of a safe environment. Prohibits modifications to EALs unless certain procedural requirements are met. Establishes a process to allow any resident to petition for modifications to an established EAL.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB54
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/16/25
Adopts the Interstate Compact to Phase Out Corporate Welfare.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB540
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/21/25
Requires state agencies to establish a Plant-Based-By-Default Program for food and drinks offered at state-operated prisons, state-licensed hospitals, and government-sponsored events. Requires the Director of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Comptroller, and Director of Health to submit annual reports to the Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation and Adaptation Commission. Effective 7/1/2026.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB541
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/21/25
Clarifies the level of environmental restoration owners and operators of underground storage tanks or tank systems that had a confirmed release must satisfy by requiring the removal of all jet fuel, including fuel additives and all compounds resulting from the degradation of jet fuel or jet fuel additives or the reaction of jet fuel or jet fuel additives with water or other chemicals. Establishes a rebuttable presumption that the detection of these contaminants in the vicinity of an underground storage tank or a tank system after a confirmed release is a result of the confirmed release.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB542
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/21/25
Requires certain priority level 1 cesspools to be upgraded, converted, or connected before 1/1/2035. Requires priority level 2 and other cesspools to be upgraded, converted, or connected before 1/1/2040, rather than before 1/1/2050, with certain exemptions. Authorizes the Director of Finance to issue general obligation bonds. Appropriates funds.