All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB665
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Requires the Hawaii State Energy Office to conduct a study to identify the most cost-effective investments for clean energy alternatives to combustible fuels. Requires a report to the Legislature.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB666
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Converts two temporary Farm-to-School extension agent positions within the University of Hawaii at Manoa College of Tropical Agriculture and Human Resilience into permanent positions. Establishes an Agriculture Education Coordinator position. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/31/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB667
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Requires state agencies that monitor environmental toxins and pollutants to establish environmental action levels (EALs) to ensure the preservation of a safe environment. Prohibits modifications to EALs unless certain procedural requirements are met. Establishes a process to allow any resident to petition for modifications to an established EAL.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB668
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Prohibits the construction, modification, or expansion of any waste or disposal facility on land that is near or above a significant aquifer as determined by the Department of Health. Reduces the required buffer zone around waste or disposal facilities.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB669
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Beginning 1/1/2026, prohibits the issuance of building permits for new single-family dwellings that are part of a development of twenty or more dwellings and do not include a rooftop photovoltaic energy generating system, unless a variance is granted by the Hawaii State Energy Office. Authorizes the Hawaii State Energy Office to adopt administrative rules.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB67
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/16/25
Refer
1/31/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Prohibits any law, ordinance, or rule from imposing an inclusionary zoning requirement on housing offered exclusively for sale or rent in perpetuity to buyers or renters who are residents of the State, are owner-occupants or renters, and do not own any other real property. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB670
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Prohibits lodging establishments in the State from providing personal care products packaged in small plastic containers in any sleeping room accommodations, space within sleeping room accommodations, and bathrooms used by the public or guests. Establishes civil penalties.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB671
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Prohibits the use of certain dangerous pesticides on state lands and at state facilities, except as needed to respond to emergencies.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB672
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds and appropriates funds for a capital improvement project for the repair, maintenance, and demolition of buildings at the Waimanalo Research Station.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB673
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Effective 7/1/2027, establishes the Environmental Stewardship Fee Program within the Department of Land and Natural Resources, through which the Department will collect a fee from visitors for a license to visit a state park, forest, hiking trail, or other state natural area. Establishes the Environmental Stewardship Fee Special Fund effective 7/1/2025. Allocates a certain amount of transient accommodations tax revenues to the special fund. Requires report to the Legislature on strategic plan and timetable for objectives and implementation of the environmental stewardship fee program. Appropriates funds for the environmental stewardship fee strategic plan and positions for the Environmental Stewardship Fee Program.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB674
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/13/25
Refer
2/13/25
Requires the Department of Health to conduct a statewide needs assessment to determine what will be needed to reduce waste generation, increase reuse, improve recycling collection services, and expand local processing of materials through an extended producer responsibility program for packaging materials and paper products. Requires the Department of Health to complete and submit the needs assessment to the Legislature no later than 12/31/2028. Establishes an advisory council to review the draft needs assessment and propose recommendations throughout the assessment process. Appropriates funds. Effective 12/31/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB675
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Establishes within the Department of Health's Wastewater Branch a Cesspool Conversion Section, which shall be responsible for facilitating the conversion of cesspools within the State. Establishes and appropriates funds for positions within the Cesspool Conversion Section. Effective 12/31/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB676
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Establishes statewide goals for solid waste reduction and organic waste diversion. Requires each county to incorporate into its next integrated solid waste management plan revision a plan to divert certain organic waste generated within the county in alignment with established state benchmarks. Appropriates funds.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB677
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Requires the Office of Planning and Sustainable Development to develop and publish a Hawaii climate adaptation and resilience implementation plan. Requires a report to the Legislature. Appropriates funds. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB678
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/10/25
Refer
2/10/25
Establishes the Agricultural Development and Food Security Special Fund. Requires a portion of the Environmental Response, Energy, and Food Security Tax to be deposited into the Special Fund. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)