All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB719
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Establishes a Sugar-Sweetened Beverage Fee Program to be administered by the Department of Health that, beginning 7/1/2026, imposes a fee on the distribution and sale of sugar-sweetened beverages in the State. Establishes the Healthy Ohana Special Fund into which revenues generated from the sugar-sweetened beverage fee are deposited. Establishes the Healthy Ohana Trust Fund in the private sector to receive revenues from the Healthy Ohana Special Fund to support prevention and control of obesity and chronic diseases. Allows the Department to contract with a third party to administer the program. Requires the Auditor to conduct a management and financial audit of the program and submit reports to the Legislature. Establishes the Healthy Ohana Trust Fund Advisory Committee to advise the Department on the administration of the trust fund. Requires the Department to adopt interim rules no later than 6/30/2026, and final rules no later than 12/31/2027. Establishes civil penalties. Requires annual reports to the Legislature. Appropriates funds.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB72
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/16/25
Requires the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation (HHFDC) to consider as a preference under chapter 201H, HRS, the proximity between the housing location and the applicant's place of employment; whether the applicant is a state or county employee; and whether the applicant is a returning resident that left the State to attend a university, college, or trade school and has graduated within the past two years. Requires, for any project developed or administered by the HHFDC under chapter 201, HRS, the HHFDC to set aside as a matter of preference an undetermined per cent of available units for state or county employees, when feasible. Requires HHFDC to determine the order of preferences and rank applicants accordingly, select applicants based on application date within the pool of similarly ranked applicants, and validate the preference status of applicants before occupancy of a unit. Authorizes HHFDC to adopt rules to establish additional eligibility criteria.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB720
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Requires the independent medical examination and permanent impairment rating examination of an injured employee under the Workers' Compensation Law to be conducted by a qualified physician selected by the mutual agreement of the parties and paid for by the employer. In absence of a mutual agreement, requires the Director of Labor and Industrial Relations to appoint a duly qualified impartial physician to be paid by the employer.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB721
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/18/25
Engrossed
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
Amends the exclusion amount of Hawaii's estate tax. Repeals exemption for tax imposed on transfer of taxable estate located in Hawaii for nonresidents and nonresidents who are not citizens. Applicable to decedents dying or taxable transfers occurring after 12/31/2024. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB722
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/4/25
Refer
2/4/25
Restricts civil asset forfeiture to cases involving the commission of a felony offense where the property owner has been convicted of an underlying felony offense. Directs forfeiture proceeds to the general fund. Amends the allowable expenses for moneys in the Criminal Forfeiture Fund. Requires the Attorney General to adopt rules necessary to carry out the purpose of the Hawaii Omnibus Criminal Forfeiture Act. Amends the deadline for the Attorney General to report to the Legislature on the use of the Hawaii Omnibus Criminal Forfeiture Act. Limits the transfer of certain forfeiture property to federal agencies. Establishes records requirements.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB723
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Increases shoreline setback requirements.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB724
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/10/25
Refer
2/10/25
Repeals the exemptions for certain dealers of deposit beverage containers and related provisions. Requires all dealers of deposit beverage containers to operate as redemption centers. Effective 7/1/2026.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB725
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Requires judges to make certain findings regarding a defendant's ability to afford bail.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB726
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Requires insurers to notify the Insurance Commissioner of all existing motor vehicle insurance policies and whenever the insurer issues, cancels, terminates, or does not renew a motor vehicle insurance policy. Requires the Insurance Commissioner to use the insurance policy information to create an electronic database to provide law enforcement and the courts with instant insurance verification. Appropriates funds.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB727
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Requires suppliers of water in the State to adjust the level of fluoride in its public water system in conformance with a standard published by the Board of Water Supply of each county until the issuance of a proclamation by the Governor declaring the date on which all residents of the State have either obtained or affirmatively rejected dental insurance coverage and provide a certified copy to the Revisor of Statutes. Requires the Department of Health to provide suppliers of water with technical assistance and training and submit annual status reports to the Legislature regarding the public water systems' status of compliance with the fluoride adjustment requirement. Allows the Department of Health to reimburse suppliers of water for necessary expenses incurred for compliance. Requires the Department of Health to monitor dental insurance coverage of the State's residents, submit annual status reports to the Legislature, and upon confirmation that all residents of the State have either obtained or affirmatively rejected dental insurance coverage, submit a written verification to the Governor. Requires the Governor to issue a proclamation. Appropriates funds.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB728
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Requires individuals denied a firearm permit or otherwise disqualified from possessing firearms and certain defendants to provide a sworn statement that the individual has disposed of any firearms and ammunition in the individual's possession. Requires the applicable chief of police to search firearm permit and registration records for those individuals before serving a protective order or restraining order involving firearms or ammunition, and to seize any firearms or ammunition that were not disposed of. Requires police to seize firearms and ammunition in domestic abuse cases that are in plain view of the officer or discovered by consensual search.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB729
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Amends the definition of "eligible business activity" for enterprise zone program purposes to include retail sales of tangible personal property manufactured and sold in the enterprise zone that is to be used or consumed by the purchaser and not for resale, the processing of value-added agricultural products grown within an enterprise zone, and the provision of professional services by health care professionals in health care related sectors.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB73
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/16/25
Report Pass
2/11/25
Refer
2/11/25
Requires county permitting agencies to establish and fill positions exclusively to process permit applications submitted for state projects. Appropriates funds. Effective 5/13/2040. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB730
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Adds definitions for certain Department of Law Enforcement employees. Establishes guidance for the computation of retirement benefits for the Director of Law Enforcement, Deputy Director of the Department of Law Enforcement, Sheriff Division Investigator, Sheriff, and Department of Law Enforcement Investigator.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB731
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Allows a retirant employed as an investigator identified by the Department of Law Enforcement or Department of the Attorney General as a labor shortage or difficult-to-fill position to be rehired without reenrollment in the Employees' Retirement System and without a loss or interruption of retirement benefits, subject to certain conditions. Requires annual reports to the Legislature to include details on the employment of retirants as investigators.