All Bills - Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session

IL

Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HB2281

Introduced
2/10/23  
Refer
2/14/23  
Introduced
2/10/23  
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that to ensure a behavioral health clinic that is enrolled as a provider under the medical assistance program maintains staff who are licensed to engage in the practice of applied behavior analysis, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall, by rule, include a behavioral analyst licensed under the Behavior Analyst Licensing Act to the Department's definition of "licensed practitioner of the healing arts". Effective immediately.
IL

Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HB2282

Introduced
2/10/23  
Refer
2/14/23  
Introduced
2/10/23  
Refer
2/28/23  
Refer
2/14/23  
Refer
6/26/23  
Refer
2/28/23  
Appropriates $5,000,000 to the Department of Public Health to be used for grants to organizations that test student athletes for being at risk of sudden cardiac death in accordance with specified provisions of the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Effective July 1, 2023.
IL

Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HB2283

Introduced
2/10/23  
Refer
2/14/23  
Introduced
2/10/23  
Refer
2/28/23  
Refer
2/14/23  
Refer
5/19/23  
Refer
2/28/23  
Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Public Health to create a grant program that provides funds to organizations that test student athletes for being at risk of sudden cardiac death, including, but not limited to, hypertrophic cardiomyopathy.
IL

Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HB2284

Introduced
2/10/23  
Refer
2/14/23  
Introduced
2/10/23  
Refer
2/21/23  
Refer
2/14/23  
Refer
3/10/23  
Refer
2/21/23  
Creates the Thyroid Guard Act. Provides that a health care facility that conducts x-ray imaging must have a thyroid guard available and require personnel conducting the x-ray imaging to give a patient the option of using it, unless the thyroid guard would directly interfere with the ability of the personnel to obtain the x-ray imaging that was ordered.
IL

Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HB2285

Introduced
2/10/23  
Refer
2/14/23  
Introduced
2/10/23  
Refer
2/28/23  
Refer
2/14/23  
Report Pass
3/8/23  
Refer
2/28/23  
Engrossed
3/24/23  
Report Pass
3/8/23  
Refer
3/27/23  
Engrossed
3/24/23  
Refer
4/12/23  
Refer
3/27/23  
Report Pass
4/19/23  
Refer
4/12/23  
Enrolled
5/10/23  
Report Pass
4/19/23  
Enrolled
5/10/23  
Chaptered
7/28/23  
Chaptered
7/28/23  
Amends the Health Care Worker Background Check Act. Adds to the definition of "health care employer", a financial management services entity contracted with the Department of Human Services, which is not the employer of personal support workers but supports individuals receiving participant directed services, to administer the individuals' employer authority. Provides that a financial management services entity assists participants in completing background check requirements, collecting and processing time sheets for support workers, and processing payroll, withholding, filing, and payment of applicable federal, State, and local employment-related taxes and insurance.
IL

Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HB2286

Introduced
2/10/23  
Refer
2/14/23  
Introduced
2/10/23  
Amends the Department of Human Services Act. In provisions concerning the Teen Responsibility, Education, Achievement, Caring, and Hope (Teen REACH) Grant Program, provides that any technical assistance provided to a statewide provider of services under the Teen REACH Grant Program shall be delivered directly by the Department of Human Services and shall not be delegated or outsourced to a third-party organization.
IL

Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HB2287

Introduced
2/10/23  
Refer
2/14/23  
Introduced
2/10/23  
Refer
2/28/23  
Refer
2/14/23  
Report Pass
3/8/23  
Refer
2/28/23  
Refer
3/27/23  
Report Pass
3/8/23  
Refer
3/27/23  
Refer
4/19/24  
Refer
3/27/23  
Refer
4/19/24  
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a school bus shall be an electric vehicle if: (1) it is newly purchased, leased, or contracted after January 1, 2028; (2) it provides transportation for enrolled students operating primarily within an equity investment eligible community or primarily serving students living in an equity investment eligible community after January 1, 2030; and (3) it provides transportation for enrolled students in the State after January 1, 2035. Effective immediately.
IL

Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HB2288

Introduced
2/10/23  
Refer
2/14/23  
Introduced
2/10/23  
Refer
2/28/23  
Refer
2/14/23  
Report Pass
3/8/23  
Refer
2/28/23  
Engrossed
3/23/23  
Report Pass
3/8/23  
Refer
3/27/23  
Engrossed
3/23/23  
Refer
4/12/23  
Refer
3/27/23  
Refer
4/28/23  
Refer
4/12/23  
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that, as used in a provision of the Code that establishes procurement goals for veteran-owned small businesses, the term "small business" means a business that has annual gross sales of less than $150,000,000 (rather than less than $75,000,000) as evidenced by the federal income tax return of the business.
IL

Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HB2289

Introduced
2/10/23  
Refer
2/14/23  
Introduced
2/10/23  
Refer
2/28/23  
Refer
2/14/23  
Report Pass
3/8/23  
Refer
2/28/23  
Engrossed
3/23/23  
Report Pass
3/8/23  
Refer
3/27/23  
Engrossed
3/23/23  
Enrolled
5/11/23  
Refer
3/27/23  
Chaptered
6/30/23  
Enrolled
5/11/23  
Chaptered
6/30/23  
Creates the First 2023 General Revisory Act. Combines multiple versions of Sections amended by more than one Public Act. Renumbers Sections of various Acts to eliminate duplication. Corrects obsolete cross-references and technical errors. Makes stylistic changes. Effective immediately.
IL

Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HB2290

Introduced
2/10/23  
Refer
2/14/23  
Introduced
2/10/23  
Amends the State and Regional Development Strategy Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
IL

Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HB2291

Introduced
2/10/23  
Refer
2/14/23  
Introduced
2/10/23  
Refer
2/28/23  
Refer
2/14/23  
Refer
6/26/23  
Refer
2/28/23  
Appropriates $10,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Human Services for grants distributed under the Access to Justice Grant Program to the Westside Justice Center and the Resurrection Project. Effective July 1, 2023.
IL

Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HB2292

Introduced
2/10/23  
Refer
2/14/23  
Introduced
2/10/23  
Refer
2/28/23  
Refer
2/14/23  
Refer
5/19/23  
Refer
2/28/23  
Refer
2/28/24  
Refer
5/19/23  
Refer
5/31/24  
Refer
2/28/24  
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. In a provision concerning the $630 per diem rate to be paid to safety net-hospitals for inpatient psychiatric services on and after January 1, 2021, removes language making the payment rate subject to appropriation. Effective July 1, 2021.
IL

Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HB2293

Introduced
2/10/23  
Refer
2/14/23  
Introduced
2/10/23  
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that the sale or transfer of firearm ammunition is subject to the Firearm Transfer Inquiry Program requiring a criminal background check by the Illinois State Police of the person before the person may acquire firearm ammunition.
IL

Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HB2294

Introduced
2/10/23  
Refer
2/14/23  
Introduced
2/10/23  
Amends the Illinois State Auditing Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the definition of "Office of Auditor General".
IL

Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HB2295

Introduced
2/10/23  
Refer
2/14/23  
Introduced
2/10/23  
Appropriates $450,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Human Services for an initial full year's implementation of a non-profit vendor that can compare and assess addiction treatment facilities to identify high quality providers and provide a publicly available search function for patients, health care providers, and first responders to find substance use disorder services. Effective July 1, 2023.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records