All Bills - Kentucky 2023 Regular Session

KY

Kentucky 2023 Regular Session

Kentucky House Bill HB91

Introduced
1/4/23  
Refer
1/4/23  
Appropriate General Fund moneys to support the Kentucky Chamber of Commerce's Talent Pipeline Management Program; APPROPRIATION.
KY

Kentucky 2023 Regular Session

Kentucky House Bill HB92

Introduced
1/4/23  
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to require that a parent or guardian be permitted to opt a student of any public school requirement for medical devices and procedures, and treatments; provide that the parent or guardian shall not be required to submit any documentation or certification to opt out; provide that nothing in the section shall be interpreted to contradict KRS 158.035; create a new section of KRS Chapter164 to provide that postsecondary education institutions may not require individuals to use medical devices or submit to medical procedures and treatments in response to the COVID-19 pandemic on property not used for the delivery of medical services; provide that a postsecondary education institution may implement a requirement for facial coverings that is not responsive to the COVID-19 pandemic; EMERGENCY.
KY

Kentucky 2023 Regular Session

Kentucky House Bill HB93

Introduced
1/4/23  
Amend KRS 341.370 to prohibit disqualification from benefits for workers unemployed as a result of domestic violence and abuse, dating violence and abuse, sexual assault, or stalking; amend KRS 341.530 to charge benefits to pooled account for workers displaced from employment through domestic or dating violence and abuse, sexual assault, or stalking; amend KRS 341.125 to require the secretary to provide training to personnel who process claims related to domestic or dating violence and abuse, sexual assault, or stalking and to report to the Legislative Research Commission annually the number of claims paid involving domestic or dating violence and abuse, sexual assault, or stalking; amend KRS 341.360 to conform; amend KRS 341.550 to prevent benefit payments from pooled account from impacting an employer's experience rating; and create a new section of KRS Chapter 341 to direct the secretary of the Education and Workforce Labor Cabinet to promulgate administrative regulations.
KY

Kentucky 2023 Regular Session

Kentucky House Bill HB94

Introduced
1/4/23  
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 262 to establish a Healthy Soils Program and a Healthy Soils Program fund in the Department for Natural Resources, Division of Conservation; require the department to provide technical advice and assistance and to assist with soil health assessments and soil health plans; require the commissioner to approve applications for grants and other types of financial assistance under the Healthy Soils Program; authorize the department to promulgate administrative regulations to implement the Healthy Soils Program and the Healthy Soils Program fund; amend KRS 146.100 to require the director of the Division of Conservation to have experience in healthy soil practices; amend KRS 224.71-110 to require the Agriculture Water Quality Authority to promote soil restoration and include an organic agriculture organization among appointments to the authority and add healthy soil practices as a committee; amend KRS 262.010 to define "healthy soil practices," "soil health," "soil health assessment, "and "watershed health"; amend KRS 262.020 to add restoration, biological diversity, watershed health, and healthy soil practices to the purpose of soil and water conservation districts; amend KRS 262.748 and 262.778 to conform; APPROPRIATION.
KY

Kentucky 2023 Regular Session

Kentucky House Bill HB95

Introduced
1/4/23  
Amend KRS 383.020 to specify duties of landlord with respect to abandoned personal property.
KY

Kentucky 2023 Regular Session

Kentucky House Bill HB96

Introduced
1/4/23  
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 247 to define terms; establish the Kentucky Urban Farming Youth Initiative to promote farming to youth in urban counties in at least one urban University of Kentucky Cooperative Extension Service office beginning August 1, 2023, and others by August 1, 2024; set each program term to 1 year in duration beginning in January; establish guidelines for participant eligibility.
KY

Kentucky 2023 Regular Session

Kentucky House Bill HB97

Introduced
1/4/23  
Propose to amend Section 145 of the Constitution of Kentucky to automatically restore the voting rights of persons convicted of certain felonies upon completion of their imprisonment, probation, or parole and automatically restore their civil rights five years after completion of their imprisonment, probation, or parole; provide ballot language; submit to voters for ratification or rejection.
KY

Kentucky 2023 Regular Session

Kentucky House Bill HB98

Introduced
1/4/23  
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 211 to establish a program for harm reduction centers; amend possession of controlled substance statutes to reduce penalty; amend KRS 218A.275 to provide for referrals to treatment for persons charged with possession of controlled substances; amend KRS 218A.500 to decriminalize possession of items to test, store, or consume controlled substances; repeal KRS 218A.14151, 218A.1450, 218A.1451, 218A.1452, and 218A.276.
KY

Kentucky 2023 Regular Session

Kentucky House Bill HB99

Introduced
1/4/23  
Refer
1/4/23  
Amend KRS 156.095 to require the Kentucky Department of Education to create a professional development training schedule for certified personnel; require each local district to implement the schedule; require an additional day to be added to the school calendar if required training cannot be completed in a single calendar day; require the General Assembly to appropriate funds for an additional calendar day if determined to be necessary.
KY

Kentucky 2023 Regular Session

Kentucky House Bill HCR14

Introduced
1/5/23  
Refer
1/5/23  
Provide that when the House of Representatives and the Senate adjourn the first part of the 2023 Regular Session, they adjourn until February 7, 2023, when the second part of the 2023 Regular Session shall convene.
KY

Kentucky 2023 Regular Session

Kentucky House Bill HCR19

Introduced
2/7/23  
Create the L.E.T.T.'s Grow Task Force to study and make recommendations related to the legalization, taxation, and use of cannabis in the Commonwealth; set task force membership; require the task force to meet at least once every two months during the 2023 Interim and to submit findings and recommendations to the Legislative Research Commission by December 1, 2023.
KY

Kentucky 2023 Regular Session

Kentucky House Bill HCR29

Introduced
2/7/23  
Designate August 31, 2023, as "Overdose Awareness Day" in remembrance of the lives of Kentuckians lost to drug overdoses; encourage the Governor to issue an annual proclamation recognizing "overdose Awareness Day."
KY

Kentucky 2023 Regular Session

Kentucky House Bill HCR34

Introduced
2/9/23  
Refer
2/9/23  
Refer
2/16/23  
Report Pass
2/21/23  
Engrossed
3/7/23  
Create the Lottery Trust Fund Task Force to study the various uses of the task fund, evaluate the performance of the various scholarship and grant programs funded by the fund, and develop and submit recommended changes to better align the uses of the fund to future needs; outline task force membership; require the task force to submit any findings and recommendations to the Legislative Research Commission by December 1, 2023.
KY

Kentucky 2023 Regular Session

Kentucky House Bill HCR5

Introduced
1/3/23  
Refer
1/3/23  
Refer
2/9/23  
Report Pass
2/14/23  
Engrossed
2/17/23  
Refer
2/17/23  
Refer
2/21/23  
Report Pass
3/15/23  
Enrolled
3/16/23  
Enrolled
3/16/23  
Chaptered
3/27/23  
Express support of the Jones Act, recognize its centennial anniversary, and encourage Congress to maintain the provisions of law.
KY

Kentucky 2023 Regular Session

Kentucky House Bill HCR50

Introduced
2/17/23  
Refer
2/17/23  
Refer
2/21/23  
Report Pass
2/22/23  
Engrossed
3/8/23  
Direct the Legislative Research Commission to establish the Workforce Innovation Task Force to conduct a review of current education and workforce development programs and provide recommendations on how to provide effective workforce development to facilitate the training and employment of historically untapped workforce populations in the Commonwealth; require the task force to meet at least 3 times before the submission of its findings and recommendations; require the task force to submit its findings and recommendations to the Legislative Research Commission by December 1, 2023; provide that the Legislative Research Commission has authority to alternatively assign the issues identified by the recommendations to the appropriate committee or subcommittee.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records