All Bills - Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR148
Introduced
3/8/23
Refer
3/8/23
Refer
3/10/23
Passed
3/30/23
Recognize April 2023 as Oral Cancer Awareness Month in Kentucky.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR149
Introduced
3/8/23
Refer
3/8/23
Refer
3/10/23
Confirm the appointment of Mark Thomas Nethery to the Fish and Wildlife Resources Commission for a term expiring December 31, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR15
Introduced
1/3/23
Refer
1/3/23
Refer
1/5/23
Passed
1/5/23
Honor Bishop Kenny Clay, Jr. and Pastor Valerie Clay for the release of their first book.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR150
Introduced
3/1/23
Refer
3/1/23
Refer
3/3/23
Passed
3/30/23
Recognize Central City on the occasion of the 150th anniversary of its founding.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR151
Introduced
3/8/23
Refer
3/8/23
Refer
3/10/23
Confirm the appointment of Mitchel T. Denham to the Kentucky Personnel Board for a term expiring January 1, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR152
Introduced
3/8/23
Refer
3/8/23
Refer
3/10/23
Confirm the reappointment of E. Lynn Hampton to the Board of Trustees of the Kentucky Retirement Systems for a term expiring June 17, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR153
Introduced
3/8/23
Refer
3/8/23
Refer
3/10/23
Report Pass
3/14/23
Confirm the appointment of John D. Cox to the Kentucky State Fair Board for a term expiring May 10, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR154
Introduced
3/8/23
Refer
3/8/23
Refer
3/10/23
Report Pass
3/14/23
Confirm the appointment of Hans G. Poppe to the Kentucky State Fair Board for a term expiring May 10, 2024.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR155
Introduced
3/8/23
Refer
3/8/23
Refer
3/10/23
Confirm the appointment of Jacob L. Brown to the Kentucky Council on Postsecondary Education for a term expiring December 31, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR156
Introduced
3/8/23
Refer
3/8/23
Refer
3/10/23
Confirm the appointment of Keith E. Hamilton to the Kentucky Community and Tecnical College System Board of Regents for a term expiring July 21, 2024.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR157
Introduced
3/8/23
Refer
3/8/23
Refer
3/10/23
Confirm the reappointment of Jacqueline Mayfield to the Education Professional Standards Board for a term expiring June 30, 2025.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR158
Introduced
3/8/23
Refer
3/8/23
Refer
3/10/23
Confirm the appointment of Edwin Ray Orange to the Eastern Kentucky University Board of Regents for a term expiring June 30, 2028.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR159
Introduced
3/8/23
Refer
3/8/23
Passed
3/9/23
Recognize the record number of women legislators elected to the 2023 General Assembly.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR16
Introduced
1/4/23
Refer
1/4/23
Refer
1/5/23
Passed
2/9/23
Honor Helen Cottongim for 50 years of service to the Boone County School District.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR160
Introduced
3/9/23
Refer
3/9/23
Refer
3/14/23
Confirm the appointment of Gregory Wade Cecil to the Fish and Wildlife Resources Commission for a term expiring December 31, 2025.