All Bills - Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR176
Introduced
3/10/23
Refer
3/10/23
Refer
3/14/23
Confirm the reappointment of Wayne Hunt to the Kentucky Agricultural Finance Corporation Board of Directors for a term expiring February 4, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR177
Introduced
3/10/23
Refer
3/10/23
Refer
3/14/23
Confirm the reappointment of Wayne Hunt to the Agricultural Development Board for a term expiring July 6, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR178
Introduced
3/10/23
Refer
3/10/23
Refer
3/14/23
Confirm the reappointment of Robert H. Foree to the Agricultural Development Board for a term expiring July 6, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR179
Introduced
3/10/23
Refer
3/10/23
Refer
3/14/23
Confirm the reappointment of Jonathan T. Noe to the Kentucky Agricultural Finance Corporation Board of Directors for a term expiring June 26, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR18
Introduced
1/4/23
Refer
1/4/23
Refer
1/5/23
Passed
2/16/23
Commemorate the career of Dr. Shelia Schuster.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR180
Introduced
3/10/23
Refer
3/10/23
Refer
3/14/23
Confirm the reappointment of Mark Barker to the Agricultural Development Board for a term expiring July 6, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR181
Introduced
3/10/23
Refer
3/10/23
Passed
3/10/23
Adjourn the Senate in honor and loving memory of Dan Hale.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR182
Introduced
3/10/23
Refer
3/10/23
Refer
3/14/23
Report Pass
3/29/23
Confirm the appointment of Ruth Shelton Martin to the Board of Nursing for a term expiring June 30, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR183
Introduced
3/10/23
Refer
3/10/23
Refer
3/14/23
Report Pass
3/29/23
Confirm the appointment of Susan Ellis to the Board of Nursing for a term expiring June 30, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR184
Introduced
3/10/23
Refer
3/10/23
Refer
3/14/23
Report Pass
3/29/23
Confirm the reappointment of Audria Denker to the Board of Nursing for a term expiring June 30, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR185
Introduced
3/10/23
Refer
3/10/23
Refer
3/14/23
Report Pass
3/29/23
Confirm the appointment of James D. Nickell to the Parole Board for a term expiring August 3, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR186
Introduced
3/10/23
Refer
3/10/23
Refer
3/14/23
Report Pass
3/29/23
Confirm the appointment of Cyndi S. Heddleston to the Parole Board for a term expiring August 3, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR187
Introduced
3/10/23
Refer
3/10/23
Refer
3/14/23
Report Pass
3/29/23
Confirm the reappointment of Ladeidra Nicole Jones to the Parole Board for a term expiring July 15, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR188
Introduced
3/10/23
Refer
3/10/23
Refer
3/14/23
Report Pass
3/29/23
Confirm the appointment of Shawn E. Helbig to the Parole Board for a term expiring August 6, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR189
Introduced
3/13/23
Refer
3/13/23
Refer
3/16/23
Confirm the appointment of Jack C. Porter to the Kentucky Lottery Corporation Board of Directors for a term expiring November 28, 2026.