All Bills - Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR19
Introduced
1/4/23
Refer
1/4/23
Refer
1/5/23
Passed
3/9/23
Honor Wendell Berry.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR190
Introduced
3/13/23
Refer
3/13/23
Refer
3/16/23
Confirm the appointment of David L. Figg to the Kentucky Lottery Corporation Board of Directors for a term expiring November 28, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR191
Introduced
3/13/23
Refer
3/13/23
Refer
3/29/23
Passed
3/30/23
Adjourn in honor and loving memory of Archie Michael "Mike" Mays.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR192
Introduced
3/13/23
Refer
3/13/23
Refer
3/16/23
Confirm the appointment of Marcie Mathews to the Kentucky Public Transportation Infrastructure Authority for a term expiring April 28, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR193
Introduced
3/13/23
Refer
3/13/23
Refer
3/16/23
Confirm the appointment of Russell Romine to the Kentucky Public Transportation Infrastructure Authority for a term expiring May 25, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR194
Introduced
3/13/23
Refer
3/13/23
Refer
3/16/23
Passed
3/30/23
Commemorate and honor the life of Juanita Hughes Nolan.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR195
Introduced
3/13/23
Refer
3/13/23
Passed
3/14/23
Honor the Martin County Cardinals, 2023 KHSAA Boys Basketball 15th Region Champions.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR196
Introduced
3/13/23
Refer
3/13/23
Refer
3/16/23
Confirm the appointment of Angela C. Hatton to the Public Service Commission for a term expiring July 1, 2025.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR197
Introduced
3/13/23
Refer
3/13/23
Refer
3/16/23
Confirm the appointment of Joshua Daniel Hicks to the Board of Claims for a term expiring June 29, 2025.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR198
Introduced
3/13/23
Refer
3/13/23
Refer
3/16/23
Confirm the appointment of Marc G. Farris to the Personnel Board for a term expiring January 1, 2024.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR199
Introduced
3/13/23
Refer
3/13/23
Refer
3/16/23
Confirm the appointment of Samuel T. Wright III to the Board of Claims for a term expiring June 29, 2023.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR2
Introduced
1/3/23
Passed
1/3/23
Adopt the Rules of Procedure for the 2023 Regular Session of the Senate.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR20
Introduced
1/4/23
Refer
1/4/23
Refer
1/5/23
Passed
2/24/23
Honor Addia Wuchner for her resolute work supporting the right to life.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR200
Introduced
3/13/23
Refer
3/13/23
Refer
3/16/23
Confirm the appointment of Barry Grant Noffsinger to the Kentucky Housing Corporation Board of Directors for a term expiring October 30, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR201
Introduced
3/13/23
Refer
3/13/23
Refer
3/16/23
Confirm the appointment of Paul Todd Case to the University of Kentucky Board of Trustees for a term expiring June 30, 2025.