All Bills - Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR202
Introduced
3/13/23
Refer
3/13/23
Passed
3/15/23
Honor the 75th anniversary of the independence of the State of Israel.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR203
Introduced
3/13/23
Refer
3/13/23
Refer
3/16/23
Confirm the appointment of LaDonna Guinn Rogers to the Kentucky Council on Postsecondary Education for a term expiring December 31, 2028.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR204
Introduced
3/13/23
Refer
3/13/23
Refer
3/16/23
Confirm the appointment of Meredith Chapman Figg to the Kentucky Council on Postsecondary Education for a term expiring December 31, 2028.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR205
Introduced
3/13/23
Refer
3/13/23
Refer
3/16/23
Confirm the appointment of Jennifer Sandlin Collins to the Kentucky Council on Postsecondary Education for a term expiring December 31, 2028.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR206
Introduced
3/13/23
Refer
3/13/23
Refer
3/16/23
Confirm the appointment of Priscilla Keller to the Education Professional Standards Board for a term expiring June 30, 2024.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR207
Introduced
3/13/23
Refer
3/13/23
Refer
3/16/23
Confirm the appointment of Christopher John Fryer to the Education Professional Standards Board for a term expiring June 30, 2023.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR208
Introduced
3/13/23
Refer
3/13/23
Refer
3/16/23
Confirm the appointment of Brian F. Lavin to the University of Louisville Board of Trustees for a term expiring January 13, 2023.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR209
Introduced
3/13/23
Refer
3/13/23
Refer
3/16/23
Confirm the appointment of Amy Shearer Lingo to the Education Professional Standards Board for a term expiring June 30, 2023.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR21
Introduced
1/4/23
Refer
1/4/23
Refer
1/5/23
Passed
3/8/23
Honor Diane Whalen upon the occasion of her retirement as mayor of the City of Florence.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR210
Introduced
3/13/23
Refer
3/13/23
Refer
3/16/23
Confirm the appointment of Lisa Marie Rudzinski to the Education Professional Standards Board for a term expiring June 30, 2025.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR211
Introduced
3/13/23
Refer
3/13/23
Refer
3/16/23
Confirm the reappointment of Betty Cook to the Governor's Postsecondary Education Nominating Committee for a term expiring April 14, 2028.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR212
Introduced
3/13/23
Refer
3/13/23
Refer
3/16/23
Confirm the reappointment of Lee Trover Todd to the Kentucky Board of Education for a term expiring April 14, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR213
Introduced
3/13/23
Refer
3/13/23
Refer
3/16/23
Confirm the appointment of Kathleen Kelly Rabinowitz to the Kentucky Community and Technical College System Board of Regents for a term expiring July 21, 2028.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR214
Introduced
3/13/23
Refer
3/13/23
Refer
3/16/23
Confirm the appointment of Clyde B. Akins to the Kentucky Council on Postsecondary Education for a term expiring December 31, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2023 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR215
Introduced
3/13/23
Refer
3/13/23
Refer
3/16/23
Confirm the appointment of Faith Lorraine Kemper to the Kentucky Council on Postsecondary Education for a term expiring December 31, 2024.