All Bills - Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR228
Introduced
3/15/24
Refer
3/15/24
Refer
3/21/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the reappointment of Kenneth Carl Smith, III as an administrative law judge in the Department of Workers' Claims.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR229
Introduced
3/15/24
Refer
3/15/24
Refer
3/21/24
Refer
4/12/24
Confirm the appointment of Rhonda Jennings Blackburn to the Morehead State University Board of Regents for a term expiring June 30, 2028.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR23
Introduced
1/2/24
Refer
1/2/24
Refer
1/3/24
Passed
2/27/24
Adjourn in honor and loving memory of Grace Pool Rucker.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR230
Introduced
3/15/24
Refer
3/15/24
Refer
3/21/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the reappointment of Scott M. Miller as a member of the Kentucky Workers' Compensation Board for a term expiring January 4, 2028.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR231
Introduced
3/15/24
Refer
3/15/24
Refer
3/21/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the reappointment of Jonathan Robert Weatherby as an administrative law judge in the Department of Workers Claims for a term expiring December 31, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR232
Introduced
3/15/24
Refer
3/15/24
Refer
3/21/24
Passed
4/12/24
Honor WGOH and WUGO radio stations for 65 years of service to Carter County.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR234
Introduced
3/15/24
Refer
3/15/24
Refer
3/21/24
Passed
3/26/24
Celebrate the 35th anniversary of the Kentucky Lottery.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR235
Introduced
3/15/24
Refer
3/15/24
Refer
3/21/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the reappointment of Sharon P. Clark as commissioner of the Department of Insurance within the Public Protection Cabinet.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR236
Introduced
3/15/24
Refer
3/15/24
Refer
3/21/24
Refer
4/12/24
Confirm the appointment of Candace McGraw to the Kentucky Community and Technical College System Board of Regents for a term expiring July 21, 2029.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR237
Introduced
3/15/24
Refer
3/15/24
Refer
3/21/24
Refer
4/12/24
Confirm the reappointment of Ashley Flaugher Himes to the Northern Kentucky University Board of Regents for a term expiring June 30, 2029.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR238
Introduced
3/15/24
Refer
3/15/24
Refer
3/21/24
Passed
4/15/24
Urge the United States Congress to fund the Horseracing Integrity and Safety Authority (HISA) through federal appropriation rather than assessment fees charged to states and race tracks.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR239
Introduced
3/21/24
Refer
3/21/24
Passed
3/21/24
Honor the Calvary Christian School and recognize its 50 years of service.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR24
Introduced
1/2/24
Refer
1/2/24
Refer
1/3/24
Passed
3/27/24
Adjourn in honor and loving memory of Joey Bott.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR240
Introduced
3/21/24
Refer
3/21/24
Passed
3/21/24
Honor the Simmons College of Kentucky Lady Falcons, 2024 NCCAA Division II basketball champions.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR241
Introduced
3/21/24
Refer
3/21/24
Refer
3/25/24
Passed
3/27/24
Recognize Tori Murden McClure for her exemplary accomplishments as an explorer, author, and the President of Spalding University and congratulate her on her retirement.