All Bills - Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR274
Introduced
3/28/24
Refer
3/28/24
Refer
4/12/24
Confirm the appointment of Janie Greer to the University of Kentucky Board of Trustees for a term expiring June 30, 2029.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR275
Introduced
3/28/24
Refer
3/28/24
Refer
4/12/24
Confirm the appointment of Christopher Lee Deglow to the Parole Board for a term expiring August 10, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR276
Introduced
3/28/24
Refer
3/28/24
Refer
4/12/24
Confirm the appointment of Cynthia Jean Nichols to the Western Kentucky University Board of Regents for a term expiring July 9, 2029.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR277
Introduced
3/28/24
Refer
3/28/24
Refer
4/12/24
Confirm the appointment of Kathryn M. Thomas to the Board of Claims for a term expiring June 29, 2025.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR278
Introduced
3/28/24
Refer
3/28/24
Refer
4/12/24
Confirm the appointment of Kristen Dawson to the Board of Physicians and Advisors.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR279
Introduced
3/28/24
Refer
3/28/24
Refer
4/12/24
Confirm the appointment of Linda McClain to the Board of Physicians and Advisors.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR28
Introduced
1/2/24
Refer
1/2/24
Refer
1/3/24
Passed
1/5/24
Honor the life and accomplishments of former Kentucky Governor Julian Morton Carroll.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR280
Introduced
3/28/24
Refer
3/28/24
Refer
4/12/24
Confirm the reappointment of Samuel T. Wright III to the Board of Claims for a term expiring June 29, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR281
Introduced
3/28/24
Refer
3/28/24
Refer
4/12/24
Confirm the appointment of Courtney Turner to the Board of Physicians and Advisors.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR282
Introduced
3/28/24
Refer
3/28/24
Refer
4/12/24
Confirm the appointment of Alex Boone to the University of Kentucky Board of Trustees for a term expiring June 30, 2029.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR283
Introduced
3/28/24
Refer
3/28/24
Refer
4/12/24
Confirm the reappointment of Gordon Ferrell Jones to the Kentucky Agricultural Development Board for a term expiring July 6, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR284
Introduced
3/28/24
Refer
3/28/24
Refer
4/12/24
Confirm the reappointment of Albert William Pedigo to the Kentucky Agricultural Development Board for a term expiring July 6, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR285
Introduced
3/28/24
Refer
3/28/24
Refer
4/12/24
Confirm the appointment of Dr. Robbie Fletcher as Commissioner of the Kentucky Department of Education for a term beginning on July 1, 2024.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR286
Introduced
3/28/24
Refer
3/28/24
Refer
4/12/24
Confirm the appointment of Lori Noel to the Kentucky Agricultural Finance Corporation Board of Directors for a term expiring August 14, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR287
Introduced
3/28/24
Refer
3/28/24
Refer
4/12/24
Passed
4/15/24
Recognize April 2024 as Child Abuse Prevention Month in Kentucky.